Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254032

EP1254032 - ROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TENTE-ROLLEN GmbH & Co. KG
Herrlinghausen 75
42929 Wermelskirchen / DE
[2003/36]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
TENTE-ROLLEN GmbH & Co.
Herlinghausen 75
D-42929 Wermelskirchen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / STICKEL, Uwe
Düsseldorfer Strasse 41
40764 Langenfeld / DE
02 / DIEDERICH, Markus
Hasenpfad 22
42929 Wermelskirchen / DE
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Müller, Enno , et al
Rieder & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt
Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Müller, Enno, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date01907404.604.01.2001
[2002/45]
WO2001EP00033
Priority number, dateDE200010601011.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10006010
DE200010879725.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10008797
DE200011110109.03.2000         Original published format: DE 10011101
[2002/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0158701
Date:16.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254032
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60B33/00, F16C13/00
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RO12.08.2002
SI12.08.2002
TitleGerman:LAUFROLLE[2002/45]
English:ROLLER[2002/45]
French:GALET DE ROULEMENT[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2002National basic fee paid 
12.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
26.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/20]
12.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US4896922  (GUETHE FRIEDRICH W [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column W *;
 [X]EP0577954  (SCHULTE SOEHNE GMBH CO A [DE]) [X] 1-6,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3894776  (BLACK JOHN W) [A] 6-8 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 11; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4592595  (FREEMAN JERRY [US]) [A] 12,13 * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 25; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE19630811  (BETA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5487610  (LAUTENSCHLAEGER HORST [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 23 - line 59; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US4535827  (SEAFORD F LEO [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 65; figures 1-3 *