Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1263697

EP1263697 - TERPOLYMERS CONSISTING OF POLYISOBUTYLENE, VINYL ESTERS AND MALEIC ACID ANHYDRIDE AND EXPOLSIVES COMPRISING SUCH POLYMERS AS EMULSIFIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/50]EXPLOSIVES CONTAINING MODIFIED COPOLYMERS CONSISTING OF POLYISOBUTYLENE, VINYL ESTERS AND MALEIC ACID ANHYDRIDE AS EMULSIFIERS
[2003/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Clariant GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2002/50]
Inventor(s)01 / KLUG, Peter
Am Hohen Stein 22
63762 Grossostheim / DE
02 / BENDER, Rolf
Grünwiesenweg 2
61440 Oberursel / DE
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Mikulecky, Klaus , et al
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Patent & License Management Chemicals
Industriepark Höchst, G 860
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Mikulecky, Klaus , et al
Clariant Service GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1
D-65843 Sulzbach/Ts. / DE
Application number, filing date01907430.110.01.2001
[2002/50]
WO2001EP00220
Priority number, dateDE200010329727.01.2000         Original published format: DE 10003297
[2002/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0155059
Date:02.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1263697
Date:11.12.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1263697
Date:10.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:C06B47/14, C08F8/14, C08F8/30
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT,   SE [2003/37]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:TERPOLYMERE AUS POLYISOBUTYLEN, VINYLESTERN UND MALEINSÄUREANHYDRID SOWIE SPRENGSTOFFE ENTHALTEND SOLCHE POLYMERE ALS EMULGATOREN[2003/12]
English:TERPOLYMERS CONSISTING OF POLYISOBUTYLENE, VINYL ESTERS AND MALEIC ACID ANHYDRIDE AND EXPOLSIVES COMPRISING SUCH POLYMERS AS EMULSIFIERS[2003/12]
French:TERPOLYMERES DE POLYISOBUTYLENE, D'ESTERS VINYLIQUES ET D'ANHYDRIDE D'ACIDE MALEIQUE ET EXPLOSIFS COMPRENANT DE TELS POLYMERES COMME EMULSIFIANTS[2003/12]
Former [2002/50]SPRENGSTOFFE, ENTHALTEND MODIFIZIERTE COPOLYMERE AUS POLYISOBUTYLEN, VINYLESTERN UND MALEINSÄUREANHYDRID ALS EMULGATOREN
Former [2002/50]EXPLOSIVES CONTAINING MODIFIED COPOLYMERS CONSISTING OF POLYISOBUTYLENE, VINYL ESTERS AND MALEIC ACID ANHYDRIDE AS EMULSIFIERS
Former [2002/50]EXPLOSIFS CONTENANT DES COPOLYMERES MODIFIES DE POLYISOBUTYLENE, D'ESTERS VINYLIQUES ET D'ANHYDRIDE D'ACIDE MALEIQUE COMME EMULSIFIANTS
Entry into regional phase27.08.2002National basic fee paid 
27.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
21.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2003Fee for grant paid
03.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0331306  (ICI AUSTRALIA OPERATIONS [AU]) [Y] 1-12 * page 2, line 38 - page 4, line 31 * * page 5, line 1 - line 15; claims 1-10 *;
 [Y]EP0561600  (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 6, line 16 - page 9, line 41; claims 1-22 *;
 [Y]US4828633  (FORSBERG JOHN W [US]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE4241948  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4931110  (MCKENZIE LEE F [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 65; claims 1-12 *;
 [A]EP0330375  (ICI AUSTRALIA OPERATIONS [AU]) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]BE729419  (MONSANTO CHEMICALS LTD.) [A] 1,11 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 1; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]EP0693509  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,11 * page 2, line 37 - page 4, line 54; claims 1-9 *;
 [DA]EP0155800  (ICI PLC [GB]) [DA] 1,9,10 * claims 1-17 *;
 [PA]EP0994087  (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-12 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 10; claims 1-13 *