Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257175

EP1257175 - USE OF ACID-STABLE SUBTILISIN PROTEASES IN ANIMAL FEED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2006
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2004/50]For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG
124 Grenzacherstrasse
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / OESTERGAARD, Peter, Rahbek
Kvaedevej 111
DK-2830 Virum / DK
02 / SJOEHOLM, Carsten
Alleroedvej 17
DK-3450 Alleroed / DK
03 / KLUENTER, Anna-Marie
Im Leh 2a
79541 Loerrach / DE
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Pedersen, Karen Oestergaard , et al
Novozymes A/S, Patents, Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Pedersen, Karen Oestergaard , et al
Novozymes, Patents, Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Application number, filing date01907489.705.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001EP01152
Priority number, dateDK2000000020008.02.2000         Original published format: DK 200000200
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0158275
Date:16.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1257175
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1257175
Date:07.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:A23K1/165, A23K1/14
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON SÄURESTABILEN SUBTILISINPROTEASEN IN TIERFUTTER[2002/47]
English:USE OF ACID-STABLE SUBTILISIN PROTEASES IN ANIMAL FEED[2002/47]
French:UTILISATION DE SUBTILISINES STABLES EN MILIEU ACIDE DANS DES ALIMENTS POUR ANIMAUX[2002/47]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase09.09.2002National basic fee paid 
09.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
17.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2005Fee for grant paid
26.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05108903.5  / EP1642506
Opposition(s)08.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.12.2005
CH07.12.2005
CY07.12.2005
IT07.12.2005
LI07.12.2005
TR07.12.2005
IE06.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
GR07.03.2006
SE07.03.2006
ES18.03.2006
PT08.05.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/37]AT07.12.2005
CH07.12.2005
IT07.12.2005
LI07.12.2005
TR07.12.2005
IE06.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
GR07.03.2006
SE07.03.2006
ES18.03.2006
PT08.05.2006
Former [2007/36]AT07.12.2005
CH07.12.2005
IT07.12.2005
LI07.12.2005
IE06.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
GR07.03.2006
SE07.03.2006
ES18.03.2006
PT08.05.2006
Former [2007/12]AT07.12.2005
CH07.12.2005
LI07.12.2005
IE06.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
GR07.03.2006
SE07.03.2006
ES18.03.2006
PT08.05.2006
Former [2007/10]AT07.12.2005
CH07.12.2005
LI07.12.2005
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
GR07.03.2006
SE07.03.2006
ES18.03.2006
PT08.05.2006
Former [2006/48]AT07.12.2005
CH07.12.2005
LI07.12.2005
MC28.02.2006
GR07.03.2006
SE07.03.2006
PT08.05.2006
Former [2006/44]AT07.12.2005
CH07.12.2005
LI07.12.2005
MC28.02.2006
GR07.03.2006
SE07.03.2006
Former [2006/38]AT07.12.2005
CH07.12.2005
LI07.12.2005
GR07.03.2006
SE07.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT07.12.2005
CH07.12.2005
LI07.12.2005
SE07.03.2006
Former [2006/33]CH07.12.2005
LI07.12.2005
SE07.03.2006
Former [2006/27]SE07.03.2006
Cited inInternational search[DXY]WO9605739  (FINNFEEDS INT LTD [GB], et al) [DX] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11,12 * example 2; claims 1,9 * [Y] 7;
 [X]WO9521540  (QUAKER OATS CO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11,12 * page 8, lines 6-11 * * example 1; claims 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9953038  (GENENCOR INT [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 6, lines 2-7 * * claims 1,9 *
 [XY]  - CAINE, W.R., VERSTEGEN, M. W. A., SAUER, W. C., TAMMINGA, S., AND SCHULZE, H., "Effect of protease treatment of soybean meal on content of total soluble matter and crude protein and level of soybean trypsin inhibitors", ANIMAL FEED SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY., AMSTERDAM., NL, (1998), vol. 71, pages 177 - 183, XP001002549 [X] 1-5,9-12 * See whole document * [Y] 7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0377-8401(97)00139-9