Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257253

EP1257253 - COSMETIC PREPARATIONS CONTAINING PLANT EXTRACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.11.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cognis France S.A.
Boussens
31360 Saint-Martory / FR
[2002/47]
Inventor(s)01 / PAULY, Gilles
5, rue de Bégonias
F-54000 Nancy / FR
02 / MOSER, Philippe
4, rue Pasteur
F-54270 Essey-les-Nancy / FR
03 / FREIS, Olga
10, avenue des Heléux
F-54280 Seichamps / FR
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Fabry, Bernd , et al
Cognis GmbH
Postfach 13 01 64
40551 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Fabry, Bernd, Dr. , et al
c/o Cognis Deutschland GmbH, CRT-IP, Postfach 13 01 64
40551 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date01907540.716.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001EP01725
Priority number, dateFR2000000242525.02.2000         Original published format: FR 0002425
[2002/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0162223
Date:30.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/35]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1257253
Date:20.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/48
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2002/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOSMETISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN ENTHALTEND PFLANZENEXTRAKTE[2002/47]
English:COSMETIC PREPARATIONS CONTAINING PLANT EXTRACTS[2002/47]
French:PREPARATIONS COSMETIQUES CONTENANT DES EXTRAITS VEGETAUX[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase16.08.2002National basic fee paid 
16.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
26.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/02]
11.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]  - DATABASE CAPLUS, Database accession no. 1992:423259, URL: STN, XP002149756 [X] 1 * abstract *
    [] - BURKHARDT ET AL., "biphenyls and xanthones from the podostemaceae", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 31, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0031-9422(92)90035-O, pages 543 - 548, XP028086495

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(92)90035-O