Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255827

EP1255827 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND THEIR USE FOR MODULATING THE EXPRESSION OF TYROSINASE INVOLVED IN THE SYNTHESIS OF MELANIC PIGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/46]NOVEL OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND USE OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES MODULATING THE EXPRESSION OF ENZYMES INVOLVED IN THE SYNTHESIS OF MELANIC PIGMENTS, AS DEPIGMENTATION AGENTS
[2006/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2007
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LVMH RECHERCHE
185 avenue de Verdun
45800 St. Jean de Braye / FR
[2006/43]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
LVMH RECHERCHE
20 avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / KURFURST, Robin
553, rue de Couasnon
F-45160 Olivet / FR
02 / JOLY, Régine
54,Rue de Boisbergues
80600 AUTHEUX / FR
 [2003/06]
Former [2002/46]01 / KURFURST, Robin
553, rue de Couasnon
F-45160 Olivet / FR
02 / JOLY, Régine
7, rue Antigna
F-45000 Orleans / FR
Representative(s)Ahner, Francis , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Ahner, Francis , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date01907764.309.02.2001
[2002/46]
WO2001FR00398
Priority number, dateFR2000000173011.02.2000         Original published format: FR 0001730
[2002/46]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0158918
Date:16.08.2001
Language:FR
[2001/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1255827
Date:13.11.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1255827
Date:04.10.2006
Language:FR
[2006/40]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1255827
Date:06.12.2006
[2006/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/11, A61K31/12, A61K31/7125
[2006/23]
Former International [2002/46]C12N15/11, A61K7/135, A61K31/12, A61K31/7125, A61K7/48, // A61P17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:OLIGONUKLEOTIDE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG UM DIE EXPRESSION DER TYROSINASE, DIE IN DER SYNTHESE VON MELANISCHEN PIGMENTEN BETEILIGT IST, ZU MODULIEREN[2006/19]
English:OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND THEIR USE FOR MODULATING THE EXPRESSION OF TYROSINASE INVOLVED IN THE SYNTHESIS OF MELANIC PIGMENTS[2006/19]
French:OLIGONUCLEOTIDES ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR MODULER L'EXPRESSION DE LA TYROSINASE INTERVENANT DANS LA SYNTHESE DE PIGMENTS MELANIQUES[2006/19]
Former [2002/46]OLIGONUKLEOTIDE DIE DIE EXPRESSION VON ENZYMEN DIE IN DER SYNTHESE VON MELANISCHEN PIGMENTEN BETEILIGT SIND MODULIEREN
Former [2002/46]NOVEL OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND USE OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES MODULATING THE EXPRESSION OF ENZYMES INVOLVED IN THE SYNTHESIS OF MELANIC PIGMENTS, AS DEPIGMENTATION AGENTS
Former [2002/46]OLIGONUCLEOTIDES MODULANT L'EXPRESSION D'ENZYMES INTERVENANT DANS LA SYNTHESE DE PIGMENTS MELANIQUES
Entry into regional phase02.09.2002National basic fee paid 
02.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
13.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2005Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.11.2005
21.10.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2005Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
10.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2006Fee for grant paid
21.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.10.2006
CY04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
TR04.10.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
LU09.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT16.03.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT04.10.2006
CY04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
LU09.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2008/19]AT04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2008/04]AT04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/48]AT04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/42]AT04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/37]AT04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/36]AT04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/28]AT04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/26]FI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/25]FI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
Former [2007/21]NL04.10.2006
ES15.01.2007
Former [2007/19]NL04.10.2006
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0714907  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-3,19,20,27,33-39 * page 3 - page 4, line 22 * * page 30; example 11 * [Y] 4-12,19-26,28-39;
 [Y]US5078989  (ANDO HIDEYA [JP], et al) [Y] 28-39 * column W *;
 [Y]WO9534280  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 28-39 * the whole document *;
 [DY]WO9925819  (HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL DE GMBH [DE], et al) [DY] 6-8,19-26 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 3 * * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 13, line 7 *;
 [X]WO9714709  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-3,19,27,33-39 * page 7, line 15 - line 28 * * page 25, line 11 - page 26, line 24 * * page 60; example 9 *;
 [A]EP0895779  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 28,39 * paragraphs [0017] - [0031] *;
 [A]WO9507924  (SHIH ANDY [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6-8,19-39 * page 37; example 16 * * page 8, paragraph L - page 10 * * claims 1-3,9 *;
 [XY]  - ZHAO, H. ET AL., "Retroviral infection with human tyrosinase-related protein-1 (TRP-1) cDNA upregulates tyrosinase activity and melanin synthesis in a TRP-1-deficient melanoma cell line.", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (1996), vol. 106, no. 4, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 744 - 752, XP000953024 [X] 1,4,5,11 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5,9-12,38

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/1523-1747.ep12345799
 [A]  - BOISSY, R. ET AL., "Human tyrosinase related protein-1 (TRP-1) does not function as a DHICA oxidase activity in contrast to murine TRP-1.", EXP DERMATOL 1998 AUG;7(4):198-204, XP000953013 [A] 1,4,5,9-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0625.1998.tb00324.x
 [DA]  - UHLMANN E ET AL, "ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDES: A NEW THERAPEUTIC PRINCIPLE", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (19900601), vol. 90, no. 4, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 543 - 584, XP000141412 [DA] 19-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr00102a001