Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257666

EP1257666 - METHOD FOR DETECTING A MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS SPECIFIC INTEIN AND USE IN DIAGNOSIS OF TUBERCULOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.05.2008
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomedical Diagnostics SA
Boulevard de Beaubourg
77183 Croissy Beaubourg / FR
[2002/47]
Inventor(s)01 / MASSON, Jean-Michel
43, chemin Flou de Rious
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
02 / LEFEVRE, Fabrice
Bâtiment B, Apt. 208, 2, rue Théodore Aubanel
F-30900 Nîmes / FR
03 / SAVES, Isabelle
34, rue du Grand Vigné
F-31140 Saint Loup Cammas / FR
04 / LANEELLE, Marie-Antoinette
46, avenue des Pyrénées
F-31320 Vigoulet-Auzil / FR
05 / DAFFE, Mamadou
50, allée Henri Sellier
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Breesé, Pierre
Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/37]Breese, Pierre
NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
Former [2005/21]Breese, Pierre
BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra
75002 Paris / FR
Former [2002/47]Sauvage, Renée
Cabinet Sauvage 65, Boulevard Soult
75012 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date01907833.616.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001FR00475
Priority number, dateFR2000000205117.02.2000         Original published format: FR 0002051
[2002/47]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0161035
Date:23.08.2001
Language:FR
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257666
Date:20.11.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:METHODE ZUM NACHWEIS MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS SPEZIFISCHER INTEINE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG FÜR TUBERKULOSE[2002/47]
English:METHOD FOR DETECTING A MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS SPECIFIC INTEIN AND USE IN DIAGNOSIS OF TUBERCULOSIS[2002/47]
French:METHODE DE DETECTION D'UNE INTEINE SPECIFIQUE DE MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS ET SON UTILISATION POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC DE LA TUBERCULOSE[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase06.09.2002National basic fee paid 
06.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
04.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/24]
18.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200303   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.2003
28.02.200707   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2007
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5795731  (BELFORT MARLENE [US]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9716564  (CIBA CORNING DIAGNOSTICS CORP [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO0034512  (PROTEUS SA [FR], et al) [PX] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - DAVIS ELAINE O ET AL, "Evidence of selection for protein introns in the RecAs of pathogenic mycobacteria.", EMBO (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY ORGANIZATION) JOURNAL, (1994), vol. 13, no. 3, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 699 - 703, XP002154585 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - DAUGELAT SABINE ET AL, "The Mycobacterium tuberculosis recA intein can be used in an ORFTRAP to select for open reading frames.", PROTEIN SCIENCE, (199903), vol. 8, no. 3, ISSN 0961-8368, pages 644 - 653, XP000961287 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PERLER FRANCINE B, "InBase, the New England Biolabs Intein Database (www.neb.com/neb/inteins.html)", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19990101), vol. 27, no. 1, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 346 - 347, XP002154586 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/27.1.346
    [ ] - "Intein Registry/Intein alleles", INBASE [ ] * abstract *
 [Y]  - COLE S T ET AL, "Deciphering the biology of Mycobacterium tuberculosis from the complete genome sequence.", NATURE (LONDON), (19980611), vol. 393, no. 6685, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 537 - 544, XP002154587 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/31159
 [Y]  - SANDER PETER ET AL, "Inteins in mycobacterial GyrA are a taxonomic character.", MICROBIOLOGY (READING), (199802), vol. 144, no. 2, ISSN 1350-0872, pages 589 - 591, XP002154588 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PERLER FRANCINE B ET AL, "Protein splicing elements: Inteins and exteins-a definition of terms and recommended nomenclature.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, no. 7, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 1125 - 1127, XP002154589 [A] * the whole document *
 [A]  - PERLER FRANCINE B ET AL, "Compilation and analysis of intein sequences.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 25, no. 6, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 1087 - 1093, XP002154590 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.6.1087
 [A]  - DAVIS ELAINE O ET AL, "Protein splicing in the maturation of Mycobacterium tuberculosis RecA protein: A mechanism for tolerating a novel class of intervening sequence.", CELL, (1992), vol. 71, no. 2, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 201 - 210, XP002154591 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(92)90349-H
 [PY]  - SAVES ISABELLE ET AL, "Inteins invading mycobacterial RecA proteins.", FEBS LETTERS, (20000901), vol. 480, no. 2-3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 221 - 225, XP002154592 [PY] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(00)01944-X