Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257611

EP1257611 - LUMINESCENT POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.12.2005
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cambridge Display Technology Limited
Building 2020
Cambourne Business Park
Cambridgeshire, CB3 6DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/47]For all designated states
Cambridge Display Technology Limited
Building 2020, Cambourne Business Park
Cambridgeshire, CB3 6DW / GB
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Cambridge Display Technology Limited
Greenwich House, Madingley Rise, Madingley Road
Cambridge, CB3 OHJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / TOWNS, Carl, Robert, Cambridge Display Tech. Ltd.
Greenwich House, Madingley Rise, Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 OHJ / GB
02 / O'DELL, Richard
Jettenstetten 23
D-84416 Taufkirchen / DE
03 / LUX, Andrea, Cambridge Display Tech. Ltd
Greenwich House, Madingley Rise, Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 OHJ / GB
 [2003/02]
Former [2002/47]01 / TOWNS, Carl, Robert, Cambridge Display Tech. Ltd.
Greenwich House, Madingley Rise, Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 OHJ / GB
02 / O'DELL, Richard, Cambridge Display Tech. Ltd.
Greenwich House, Madingley Rise, Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 OHJ / GB
03 / LUX, Andrea, Cambridge Display Tech. Ltd
Greenwich House, Madingley Rise, Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 OHJ / GB
Application number, filing date01907911.026.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001GB00825
Priority number, dateGB2000000454125.02.2000         Original published format: GB 0004541
WO2000GB0091113.03.2000         Original published format: PCT/GB00/00911
US20000207724P26.05.2000         Original published format: US 207724 P
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0162869
Date:30.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257611
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1257611
Date:02.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:C09K11/06, H05B33/14, H01L51/20
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:LUMINESZENTE POLYMER[2002/47]
English:LUMINESCENT POLYMER[2002/47]
French:POLYMERE LUMINESCENT[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2002National basic fee paid 
12.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
09.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2004Fee for grant paid
26.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:all designated states
Date:30.09.2004
[2005/13]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
IT02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
TR02.02.2005
CY26.02.2005
LU26.02.2005
IE28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
PT02.07.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/36]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
IT02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
TR02.02.2005
CY26.02.2005
LU26.02.2005
IE28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2007/20]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
TR02.02.2005
CY26.02.2005
LU26.02.2005
IE28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2007/10]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
TR02.02.2005
LU26.02.2005
IE28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2006/51]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
TR02.02.2005
IE28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2006/23]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
IE28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2006/14]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK02.05.2005
GR02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2006/12]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
CH02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
LI02.02.2005
DK02.05.2005
SE02.05.2005
ES13.05.2005
Former [2005/51]AT02.02.2005
BE02.02.2005
FI02.02.2005
SE02.05.2005
Former [2005/48]FI02.02.2005
SE02.05.2005
Former [2005/46]FI02.02.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19709185  (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-9,14,16-19,21-23,25-43 * examples 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9732914  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,14,16-19,21-23,25-43 * examples 4-6 *;
 [PX]WO0046321  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [PX] 1-10,12-16,20-23,25-34,37-43 * Copolymer 10 *;; claims 1,13,14; table 1 *;
 [A]US5777070  (INBASEKARAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-43 * example 2 *;
 [A]WO9954385  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-43 * the whole document *
 [X]  - YAMAMOTO, TAKAKAZU ET AL, ".pi.- Conjugated Donor - Acceptor Copolymers Constituted of.pi.-Excessive and.pi.-Deficient Arylene Units. Optical and Electrochemical Properties in Relation to CT Structure of the Polymer", J. AM. CHEM. SOC. (1996), 118(43), 10389-10399, XP002165566 [X] 1-5,9,10,12-14,17-19,25-43 * Chart 2 *; page 10391, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja961550t
 [DX]  - NG P K ET AL, "QUINOXALINE-BASED CONJUGATED POLYMERS CONTAINING RUTHENIUM(II) BIPYRIDINE METAL COMPLEX", MACROMOLECULAR: RAPID COMMUNICATIONS,DE,WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, (19971201), vol. 18, no. 12, ISSN 1022-1336, pages 1009 - 1016, XP000738968 [DX] 1-9,11-14,16-18,21-23,25-43 * Scheme 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/marc.1997.030181203
 [DA]  - KITAMURA, CHITOSHI ET AL, "Design of Narrow - Bandgap Polymers. Synthese and Properties of Monomers and Polymers Containing Aromatic - Donor and o-Quinoid-Acceptor Units", CHEM. MATER. (1996), 8(2), 570-8, XP002165567 [DA] 1-43 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm950467m