blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1266291 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1266291



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 233
25.02.2011 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.03.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.02.2010 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 2
03.02.2010 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
03.02.2010 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
27.01.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.01.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.01.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
27.01.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
27.01.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.01.2010 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
29.09.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.09.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
29.09.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.09.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
15.09.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.09.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.08.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.08.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
19.08.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
19.08.2009 Description Search / examination 10
19.08.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.08.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
09.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
08.07.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.07.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
03.07.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
03.07.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.08.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.08.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
07.08.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
07.08.2008 Description Search / examination 2
07.08.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.08.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
20.06.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.06.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.06.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.06.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.06.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.01.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
31.01.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.01.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.10.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
06.11.2002 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
06.11.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
31.10.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
29.10.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.09.2002 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
31.08.2002 Annex Search / examination 5
31.08.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.04.2002 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
03.04.2002 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.04.2002 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.04.2002 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.04.2002 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.04.2002 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.04.2002 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.04.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.04.2002 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.03.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.02.2002 Written opinion - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
19.10.2001 Priority document Search / examination 24
11.10.2001 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
08.10.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
27.09.2001 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.09.2001 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 20
17.09.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.09.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.09.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
07.09.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
30.03.2001 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
16.03.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
16.03.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 3
16.03.2001 Description International Searching Authority 13
16.03.2001 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
16.03.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 2