Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1266291

EP1266291 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISTINGUISHING REACHABLE OBJECTS AND NON-REACHABLE OBJECTS IN AN OBJECT-BASED APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2011
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[2010/16]
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAENTSCH, Michael
Wilenbuehlstrasse 13
CH-8135 Langnau am Albis / CH
02 / BUHLER, Peter
Muehlestrasse 39
CH-8803 Rueschlikon / CH
03 / EIRICH, Thomas
Robert-Walser-Strasse 50
CH-8820 Waedenswil / CH
04 / HOERING, Frank
Culmannstrasse 39
CH-8006 Zürich / CH
05 / OESTREICHER, Marcus
Kernstrasse 34
CH-8004 Zürich / CH
 [2010/16]
Former [2002/51]01 / BAENTSCH, Michael
Wilenbuehlstrasse 13
CH-8135 Langnau am Albis / CH
02 / BUHLER, Peter
Muehlestrasse 39
CH-8803 Rueschlikon / CH
03 / EIRICH, Thomas
Robert-Walser-Strasse 50
CH-8820 Waedenswil / CH
04 / HOERING, Frank
Culmannstrasse 39
CH-8006 Zurich / CH
05 / OESTREICHER, Marcus
Kernstrasse 34
CH-8004 Zurich / CH
Representative(s)Meyer, Michael Josef , et al
IBM Research GmbH
Zurich Research Laboratory
Säumerstrasse 4
8803 Rüschlikon / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Meyer, Michael Josef , et al
IBM Research GmbH Zurich Research Laboratory Säumerstrasse 4
8803 Rüschlikon / CH
Former [2002/51]Williams, Julian David
International Business Machines Corporation, Säumerstrasse 4
8803 Rüschlikon / CH
Application number, filing date01908057.109.03.2001
[2002/51]
WO2001IB00329
Priority number, dateEP2000081025324.03.2000         Original published format: EP 00810253
[2002/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0171506
Date:27.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1266291
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001
[2002/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1266291
Date:21.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/02
[2002/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSCHEIDUNG VON ERREICHBAREN OBJEKTEN UND NICHT-ERREICHBAREN OBJEKTEN IN EINEM OBJEKTBASIERTEN ANWENDUNGSPROGRAMM[2002/51]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISTINGUISHING REACHABLE OBJECTS AND NON-REACHABLE OBJECTS IN AN OBJECT-BASED APPLICATION[2002/51]
French:TECHNIQUE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DISTINGUER DES OBJETS ACCESSIBLES ET DES OBJETS NON ACCESSIBLES DANS UNE APPLICATION A BASE D'OBJETS[2002/51]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2002National basic fee paid 
16.10.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
31.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.10.2009
29.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2009Date of oral proceedings
07.10.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
27.01.2010Fee for grant paid
27.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
19.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
CY21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
IT21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
TR21.04.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
[2013/44]
Former [2011/14]AT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
CY21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
IT21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
Former [2011/13]AT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
CY21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
Former [2011/08]AT21.04.2010
CY21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
Former [2011/07]AT21.04.2010
CY21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
Former [2011/05]AT21.04.2010
CY21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
Former [2011/01]AT21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
Former [2010/50]AT21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
ES01.08.2010
Former [2010/49]AT21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
ES01.08.2010
Former [2010/46]NL21.04.2010
ES01.08.2010
Former [2010/45]NL21.04.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0955588  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-7,9-17 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 58; claims 1,3,5-12,15,16,18,20-27 *;
 [A]EP0955577  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,11 * column 2, line 14 - line 23; claims 1,5-10,19,20 *
by applicantEP0955588
 EP0955577