Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259994

EP1259994 - FUEL CELL POWER GENERATION METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2006
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
[2006/02]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SU, Qingquan, c/o Ebara Corporation
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
02 / KINOSHITA, Kazuo, c/o Ebara Corporation
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
03 / TANAKA, Yasuo, c/o Ebara Corporation
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
04 / TOGO, Tomohiro, c/o Ebara Corporation
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
 [2003/04]
Former [2002/48]01 / SU, Qingquan, c/o Ebara Corporation
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
02 / KINOSHITA, Kazuo, c/o Ebara Corporation
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
03 / TANAKA, Yasuo, c/o Ebara Corporation
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
04 / TOHGO, Tomohiro, c/o Ebara Corporation
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
Representative(s)Emde, Eric
Wagner & Geyer
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Emde, Eric
Wagner & Geyer, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01908260.102.03.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001JP01633
Priority number, dateJP2000005773002.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000057730
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0165621
Date:07.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1259994
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1259994
Date:11.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/06, B01D53/14
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:BRENNSTOFFZELLEN-ENERGIEGEWINNUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM[2002/48]
English:FUEL CELL POWER GENERATION METHOD AND SYSTEM[2002/48]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE GENERATION D'ENERGIE DE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase17.09.2002National basic fee paid 
17.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
10.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2005Fee for grant paid
07.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
08.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200404   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CY11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
TR11.01.2006
IE02.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
GR12.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/38]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
TR11.01.2006
IE02.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
GR12.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2008/19]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
IE02.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
GR12.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2007/45]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
IE02.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2007/36]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
IT11.01.2006
IE02.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2007/13]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
IE02.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2007/12]AT11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
IE02.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2007/10]AT11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2006/51]AT11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2006/48]AT11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
MC31.03.2006
SE11.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2006/46]AT11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
MC31.03.2006
SE11.04.2006
Former [2006/43]AT11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
Former [2006/36]FI11.01.2006
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPH0929295  ;
 [Y]JPH07118669  ;
 [X]JPH07996  ;
 [PX]JP2000294266  ;
 [PX]WO0104046  (EBARA CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 1,9,12,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9718885  (INT FUEL CELLS CORP [US]) [A] 1,12 * page 4, line 7 - line 12; claims 1,3 *;
 [A]JPH07169495  ;
 [A]JPH11126629
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, [Y] 1,7-9,12,18 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, [Y] 1,7-9,12,18 * abstract *
 [Y]  - NAUMANN S T ET AL, "Fuel processing of biogas for small fuel cell power plants", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, (19950701), vol. 56, no. 1, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 45 - 49, XP004044365 [Y] 1,7-9,12,18 * page 46, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-7753(95)02203-S
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, [X] 1,9,12,18 * abstract *
 [X]  - STANIFORTH J ET AL, "Cannock landfill gas powering a small tubular solid oxide fuel cell - a case study", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, (200003), vol. 86, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 401 - 403, XP004194150 [X] 1,12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(99)00417-6
    [] - STANIFORTH J ET AL, "Cannock landfill gas powering a small tubular oxide fuel cell - a case study", DATABASE INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002169634 [ ] * abstract *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, [PX] 1,12 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, [A] 1,12 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, [A] 1,12 * abstract *