Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257714

EP1257714 - JOINT BETWEEN TWO BUILDING COMPONENTS CONSISTING OF SOLID WOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Martinsons Trä AB
937 80 Bygdsiljum / SE
For all designated states
Norra Massivträ AB
P.O. Box 262
931 23 Skelleftea / SE
[2002/47]
Inventor(s)01 / GUSTAFSSON, Karl, Martin
Nygatan 144
S-931 35 Skelleftea / SE
02 / GUSTAFSSON, Stig, Anders, Lennart
Södra Ringvägen 4
S-932 33 Skelleftehamn / SE
 [2004/27]
Former [2002/47]01 / GUSTAFSSON, Karl, Martin
Nygatan 144
S-931 35 Skellefte / SE
02 / GUSTAFSSON, Stig, Anders, Lennart
Södra Ringvägen 4
S-932 33 Skelleftehamn / SE
Representative(s)Zetterström, Alf , et al
Alf Zetterström AB
Sagvägen 12
184 85 Akersberga / SE
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Zetterström, Alf , et al
Alf Zetterström AB Sagvägen 12
184 85 Akersberga / SE
Application number, filing date01908555.423.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001SE00400
Priority number, dateSE2000000059023.02.2000         Original published format: SE 0000590
[2002/47]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0163062
Date:30.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257714
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE30.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:E04B1/10
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
TitleGerman:MASSIVHOLZVERBINDUNG VON ZWEI GEBÄUDEKONSTRUKTIONSTEILEN[2002/47]
English:JOINT BETWEEN TWO BUILDING COMPONENTS CONSISTING OF SOLID WOOD[2002/47]
French:ASSEMBLAGE DE DEUX COMPOSANTS DE CONSTRUCTION REALISES DANS DU BOIS MASSIF[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase26.07.2002National basic fee paid 
26.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
29.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
24.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/14]
05.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US4630418  (DEGUT ANDRE [FR]);
 [A]FR2621058  (VERRAES WOLFGANG [BE]);
 [A]FR2568163  (CLOSTYL [FR]);
 [A]US3440784  (ONJUKKA VEIKKO F);
 [A]DE2608373  (SCHERTLER RUDOLF)