Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1263588

EP1263588 - MULTILAYER METALLIZED POLYOLEFIN FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.05.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.06.2006  [2006/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
5200 Bayway Drive
Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION
5200 Bayway Drive
Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MALLORY, William
133 N. St. Regis Drive
Rochester, NY 14618 / US
02 / MIGLIORINI, Robert
303 Meadowlark Lane
Victor, NY 14564 / US
03 / PARR, Larry
19 Academy Place
Canandaigua, NY 14424 / US
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Intellectual Property Shared Services P.O. Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Application number, filing date01908649.522.01.2001
[2002/50]
WO2001US02005
Priority number, dateUS2000049047724.01.2000         Original published format: US 490477
[2002/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0153077
Date:26.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1263588
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/32, C08J7/04
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRSCHICHTIGE METALLISIERTE POLYOLEFINFOLIE[2002/50]
English:MULTILAYER METALLIZED POLYOLEFIN FILM[2002/50]
French:FILM DE POLYOLEFINE METALLISE MULTICOUCHE[2002/50]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2002National basic fee paid 
19.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
27.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/25]
25.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200606   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US4457977  (WALLES WILHELM E [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 52 - column 6, line 35 *;
 [X]EP0680823  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * page 3, line 33 - line 58 * * page 5, line 39 - line 43 * * examples 23,25 *;
 [X]DE4344438  (RENKER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3-7 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 58 * * examples 3,4 *;
 [X]EP0698634  (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-7 * page 3, line 45 - page 7, line 22 *