Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1276611

EP1276611 - COMPOSITION AND FILMS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Washington Street - 1790 Building
Midland MI 48674 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/04]For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Washington Street, 1790 Building
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TAU, Li-Min
113 Poinciana Street
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
02 / MADENJIAN, Lisa, S.
110 Schrader Lane
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
03 / THOEN, Johan, A.
Dommelstraat 22
NL-4535 HB Terneuzen / NL
04 / HOENIG, Wendy, D.
205 Violet
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
05 / CHUM, Pak-Wing, S.
126 Juniper Street
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
06 / KAARTO, John
1459 Fayolle Avenue
Verdun, Quebec HH 2S4 / CA
07 / FALLA, Daniel, James
2105 Blackwell Road
Sarnia, Ontario N7T 7K7 / CA
 [2003/04]
Representative(s)Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/04]Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date01908687.524.01.2001
[2003/04]
WO2001US02394
Priority number, dateUS20000177781P24.01.2000         Original published format: US 177781 P
US20000211048P12.06.2000         Original published format: US 211048 P
US20000232977P14.09.2000         Original published format: US 232977 P
US20000257513P22.12.2000         Original published format: US 257513 P
[2003/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0153078
Date:26.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1276611
Date:22.01.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001
[2003/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1276611
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/32, C08F8/34, C08L23/10
[2003/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FOLIEN DARAUS[2003/04]
English:COMPOSITION AND FILMS THEREOF[2003/04]
French:COMPOSITION ET FILMS ASSOCIES[2003/04]
Entry into regional phase26.08.2002National basic fee paid 
26.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.08.2002Examination requested  [2003/04]
07.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2004Fee for grant paid
18.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.04.2004
BE21.04.2004
CH21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
LI21.04.2004
TR21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
PT21.09.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2006/51]AT21.04.2004
BE21.04.2004
CH21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
LI21.04.2004
TR21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/18]AT21.04.2004
BE21.04.2004
CH21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
LI21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/14]AT21.04.2004
BE21.04.2004
CH21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
LI21.04.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/11]AT21.04.2004
CH21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
LI21.04.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/06]CH21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
LI21.04.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/02]CH21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
LI21.04.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2004/52]CH21.04.2004
LI21.04.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2004/51]CH21.04.2004
LI21.04.2004
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO0078861  (KAARTO JOHN ;THOEN JOHAN A (NL); CHUM PAK WING S (US); DOW CHEMICA) [PX] 1-46 * page 21, line 19 - page 22, line 6 * * claims 36-44 *;
 [PA]WO0078858  (ANSEMS PATRICIA ;DOW CHEMICAL CO (US); SILVIS H CRAIG (US); MADENJ) [PA] 1-46 * page 4, line 7 - page 7, line 18 *;
 [A]US3336268  (WILLIAM W COX) [A] 1-46 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 13 *;
 [A]US4532189  (MUELLER WALTER B) [A] 1-46 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 53 *