Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1253921

EP1253921 - TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF PROSTATE CANCER WITH A COX-2 SELECTIVE INHIBITING DRUG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.12.2005
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 08.07.2009  [2009/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WALDSTREICHER, Joanne
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
02 / MORRISON, Briggs, W.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc.
European Patent Department
Terlings Park
Eastwick Road, Harlow
Essex CM20 2QR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/28]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow
Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Former [2002/45]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Application number, filing date01908690.925.01.2001
[2002/45]
WO2001US02405
Priority number, dateUS20000178722P28.01.2000         Original published format: US 178722 P
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0154688
Date:02.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1253921
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.08.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/341
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
Extension statesAL28.08.2002
LT28.08.2002
LV28.08.2002
MK28.08.2002
RO28.08.2002
SI28.08.2002
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG UND PROPHYLAXE DES PROSTATAKREBS MIT COX-2 SELEKTIVEN INHIBITOREN[2002/45]
English:TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF PROSTATE CANCER WITH A COX-2 SELECTIVE INHIBITING DRUG[2002/45]
French:TRAITEMENT OU PREVENTION DU CANCER DE LA PROSTATE AVEC UN MEDICAMENT INHIBITEUR SELECTIF DE COX-2[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase28.08.2002National basic fee paid 
28.08.2002Search fee paid 
28.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
07.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/03]
19.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9714691  (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 41, line 26 - page 42, line 4; claims 1-39 *;
 [X]WO9816227  (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - line 9 * * page 4, line 14 - line 37 * * claims 1-20 *;
 [E]WO0160365  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [E] 1-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 4 * * claims 1-10 *;
 [E]WO0247707  (PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al) [E] 1,2 * claims 1-51 *;
 [A]  CRYER B ET AL, The advent of highly selective inhibitors of cyclooxygenase-a review - Implications for gastrointestinal toxicity, PROSTAGLANDINS AND OTHER LIPID MEDIATORS, BUTTERWORTH, STONEHAM, MA, US, PAGE(S) 341-361, ISSN 0090-6980, XP004156755

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0090-6980(98)00064-1
 [A]  LIPPMAN S M ET AL, CANCER CHEMOPREVENTION: PROGRESS AND PROMISE, JOURNAL OF THE NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE, US DEPT. OF HEALTH, EDICATIONAND WELFARE, PUBLIC HEALTH, US, PAGE(S) 1514-1528, ISSN 0027-8874, XP001038662 [A] * table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jnci/90.20.1514
International search[Y]  - LIU ET AL., "Upregulation of vascular endothelial growth factor by cobalt chloride-simulated hypoxia is mediated by persistent induction of cyclooxygenase-2 in a metastatic human prostate cancer cell line", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL METASTASIS, (1999), vol. 17, no. 8, pages 687 - 694, XP002941003

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006728119549