Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258107

EP1258107 - COMMUNICATIONS MODULE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.02.2008  [2008/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY
1701 Byrd Avenue
Richmond, VA 23230 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/48]For all designated states
ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY
1701 Byrd Avenue
Richmond, VA 23230-3011 / US
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Robert Shaw Controls Company
2809 Emerywood Parkway
Richmont, VA 23294-3743 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAILEY, Graham
Ritter von Weingartenstrasse 8
67366 Weingarten / DE
02 / SHAROOD, John
P.O. Box 26544
Richmond, VA 23261-6544 / US
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Howe, Steven , et al
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/01]Howe, Steven , et al
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Former [2002/47]Howe, Steven , et al
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date01908766.701.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001US03203
Priority number, dateUS2000051131323.02.2000         Original published format: US 511313
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0163848
Date:30.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258107
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1258107
Date:21.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04B3/54, H04L12/56, H04L29/06
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2002/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSMODUL UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2002/47]
English:COMMUNICATIONS MODULE AND SYSTEM[2002/47]
French:MODULE ET SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2002National basic fee paid 
03.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
12.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.09.2006
30.08.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
08.09.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
28.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2007Fee for grant paid
05.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
05.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:all designated states
Date:07.06.2004
ID:02
For:DE ES FR GB
Date:18.10.2006
[2007/21]
Former [2004/47]ID:01
For:all designated states
Date:07.06.2004
[2007/21]
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0893745  (ABB PATENT GMBH) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,12,15-17 * the whole document * [A] 13;
 [X]WO9965219  (IREADY CORP) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * page 18, line 28 - page 19, line 10 * * page 25, line 4 - line 14 * * claims 16,19,38 *;
 [XA]US5335276  (BIRDWELL GERALD G ET AL) [X] 1,3,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 11 * * column 10, line 15 - line 21 * * column 15, line 29 - column 17, line 44 * * figures 2,3,7,8,10 * [A] 4,7,12,16,17;
 [A]US6005476  (VALIULIS CARL) [A] 1-3,7,12,13,16,17 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 65 * * column 7, line 43 - column 9, line 43 * * column 10, line 6 - line 21 *;
 [A]EP0687794  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1,2,5 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 7 * * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 1 *;
 [A]US5938757  (BERTSCH LUDO ARDEN) [A] 1,2,5,12,13,17 * abstract * * column 1, line 21 - column 4, line 54 * * column 5, line 9 - line 12 * * column 6, line 44 - column 8, line 23 *