25.01.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
30.11.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
20.04.2007 |
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
16.02.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] |
13.02.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.02.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.10.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
26.09.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.08.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
30.03.2006 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
15.02.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.02.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.12.2004 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
01.10.2004 |
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution |
published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] |
02.04.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
18.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.09.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.07.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.03.2003 |
First examination report |
|
07.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.02.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.10.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] |
04.10.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] |
27.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.09.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
05.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|