Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256148

EP1256148 - DIFFERENTIAL SIGNAL ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.06.2004
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.08.2004  [2004/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Teradyne, Inc.
Legal. Dept., 321 Harrison Avenue
Boston, MA 02118 / US
For all designated states
Stokoe, Philip T.
23 County View Road
Attleboro, MA 02703 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
TERADYNE, INC.
Legal. Dept., 321 Harrison Avenue
Boston, MA 02118 / US
For all designated states
Stokoe, Philip T.
23 County View Road
Attleboro, MA 02703 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STOKOE, Philip, T.
23 Country View Road
Attleboro, MA 02703 / US
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date01908772.531.01.2001
[2002/46]
WO2001US03238
Priority number, dateUS2000049825603.02.2000         Original published format: US 498256
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0157964
Date:09.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1256148
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01R12/20, H01R13/514
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHER DIFFERENZSIGNALVERBINDER[2002/46]
English:DIFFERENTIAL SIGNAL ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR[2002/46]
French:CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE A SIGNAUX DIFFERENTIELS[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2002National basic fee paid 
03.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
04.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/32]
01.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0924812  (BERG ELECTRONICS MFG [NL]) [Y] 1-4,6,9,10 * column 6, line 17 - column 11, line 36; figure - *;
 [DY]US4975084  (FEDDER JAMES L [US], et al) [DY] 1-4,6,9,10 * column 3 - column 10, line 30; figures 5A,5B,6A,14,25 *;
 [DA]US5484310  (MCNAMARA DAVID M [US], et al) [DA] 10 * column 3, line 51 - line 52; figure 1 *