Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254112

EP1254112 - OCULAR HYPOTENSIVE LIPIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.01.2009
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.01.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.02.2009  [2009/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Allergan, Inc.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, California 92612 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WOODWARD, David, F.
22736 Islamare Lane
Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US
02 / USANSKY, Helen, H.
5 Decker Lane
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
03 / ANDREWS, Steven, W.
20 Calle Gazapo
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US
04 / BURK, Robert, M.
1337 Cerritos Drive
Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US
05 / CHEN, June
28771 Via Los Arboles
San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US
06 / KRAUSS, Achim, H., P.
10 Toulon Avenue
Foothill Ranch, CA 92610 / US
07 / MADHU, Cherukury
17186 Orchard Ridge Road
Northville, MI 48167 / US
 [2003/02]
Former [2002/45]01 / WOODWARD, David, F.
23152 Tulip Street
Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US
02 / USANSKY, Helen, H.
5 Decker Lane
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
03 / ANDREWS, Steven, W.
20 Calle Gazapo
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US
04 / BURK, Robert, M.
1337 Cerritos Drive
Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US
05 / CHEN, June
28771 Via Los Arboles
San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US
06 / KRAUSS, Achim, H., P.
10 Toulon Avenue
Foothill Ranch, CA 92610 / US
07 / MADHU, Cherukury
9744 Dee Road, 312
Des Plaines, IL 60016 / US
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date01908839.205.02.2001
[2002/45]
WO2001US03665
Priority number, dateUS2000050014208.02.2000         Original published format: US 500142
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0158866
Date:16.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1254112
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07C405/00, // A61K31:557
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:OKULARE HYPOTENSIVE LIPIDE[2002/45]
English:OCULAR HYPOTENSIVE LIPIDS[2002/45]
French:LIPIDES OCULAIRES HYPOALLERGENIQUES[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase07.08.2002National basic fee paid 
07.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
21.10.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/09]
10.10.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200808   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9925358  (ALLERGAN SALES INC [US]) [X] 1-34 * page 27; figure 4; claim - *;
 [X]FR2258372  (ARIES ROBERT [FR]) [X] 1-34 * page 1, line 6; claim - *;
 [X]JPS5071650  (YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO.) [X] 1-34 * claim - *;
 [X]GB1439511  (PFIZER) [X] 1-34 * claim - *;
 [X]WO9636599  (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [X] 1-34 * claim - *
 [A]  - SCHAAF, THOMAS K. ET AL, "Synthesis and biological activity of carboxyl-terminus modified prostaglandin analogs", J. MED. CHEM. (1979), 22(11), 1340-6, XP002184770 [A] 1-34 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00197a012
 [X]  - WOODWARD, D. F. ET AL, "Neutral replacement of the carboxylic acid group of prostaglandin F2alpha provides a novel series of ocular hypotensive lipids with pharmacological activity distinct from prostanoids.", IOVS, (MARCH 15, 1998) VOL. 39, NO. 4, PP. S420. MEETING INFO.: ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN VISION AND OPHTHALMOLOGY FORT LAUDERDALE, FLORIDA, USA MAY 10-15, 1998 ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN VISION AND OPHTHALMOLOGY., XP001041773 [X] 1-34 * abstract *