Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1257921 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1257921



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 575
07.03.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 2
01.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.02.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
29.02.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
03.12.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
18.11.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
08.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.09.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
04.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
04.09.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 14
02.09.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.11.2013 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
21.11.2013 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
27.03.2012 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
27.02.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
20.02.2012 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 3
28.02.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
10.12.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
03.12.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
23.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
23.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
23.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
23.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
23.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
23.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
23.11.2010 Claims Appeal 2
23.11.2010 Claims Appeal 2
23.11.2010 Claims Appeal 1
23.11.2010 Claims Appeal 2
23.11.2010 Claims Appeal 1
23.11.2010 Claims Appeal 2
23.11.2010 Claims Appeal 2
23.11.2010 Claims Appeal 2
23.11.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Appeal 1
23.11.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
23.11.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
14.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.09.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.09.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
17.08.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.08.2010 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
20.07.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.07.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
15.07.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
15.07.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
15.07.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
15.07.2010 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
15.07.2010 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
15.07.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
15.07.2010 Means of redress Search / examination 2
15.07.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.07.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.07.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.07.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.05.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
06.05.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
06.05.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
30.04.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
30.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
30.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
30.04.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
30.04.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.04.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.04.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
29.04.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
29.04.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
26.04.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.04.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
01.04.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
01.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
01.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
01.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
01.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
01.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
01.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
01.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
01.04.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.04.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
19.01.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
16.01.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.01.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
13.01.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.01.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.12.2008 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 8
19.12.2008 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 2
19.12.2008 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 3
19.12.2008 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 6
19.12.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
14.05.2008 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
14.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
14.05.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
06.05.2008 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
06.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
06.05.2008 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
06.05.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
26.10.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
26.10.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
22.10.2007 Description Search / examination 2
22.10.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
17.10.2007 Description Search / examination 2
17.10.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.10.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.04.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.04.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
02.03.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.02.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.02.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.11.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.11.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
18.10.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.10.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.09.2006 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
05.09.2006 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
18.08.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.08.2006 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
02.06.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.06.2006 Partial European search report Search / examination 4
29.03.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
08.03.2005 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
03.02.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
31.10.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
31.10.2002 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 66
09.10.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.09.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
24.09.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.09.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.09.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.07.2002 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.07.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.01.2002 Notification relating to priority claim Search / examination 1
10.01.2002 Priority document Search / examination 10
10.01.2002 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) Search / examination 1
31.08.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
27.08.2001 Priority document Search / examination 40
27.08.2001 Priority document Search / examination 52
23.08.2001 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
23.08.2001 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 66