blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1163686 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1163686



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 148
02.02.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.06.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
17.06.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
12.05.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.05.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
12.05.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
10.02.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.02.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
10.02.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
08.10.2003 General enquiry Search / examination 1
24.06.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.06.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.05.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
23.05.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 6
03.01.2002 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.11.2001 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
07.11.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.08.2001 Priority document Search / examination 12
22.08.2001 Priority document Search / examination 16
16.08.2001 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
03.08.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
26.07.2001 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
26.07.2001 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 24
09.05.2001 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
15.03.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
15.03.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 6
15.03.2001 Description International Searching Authority 10
15.03.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 6