blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1163686


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.06.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.07.2005  [2005/29]
11.06.2004 (Expected) grant published on  28.07.2004  [2004/31]
21.05.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
21.05.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
11.02.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.01.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.06.2003 Change - representative published on  23.07.2003  [2003/30]
04.02.2003 Renewal fee
25.01.2002 Request for examination filed published on  13.03.2002  [2002/11]
02.11.2001 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.12.2001 [2001/51]
01.11.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
01.11.2001 Change - extension states
28.08.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
31.07.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2001 PCT data prior to European publication