blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1163686

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
Examination procedure12.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase16.08.2001National basic fee paid 
03.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted28.07.2004
Opposition procedure29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit published on 13.07.2005 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.12.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:13.03.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20020103
 
Event date:28.07.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR
 
Event date:25.08.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:GERMAN
 
Event date:02.09.2004 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:50102969
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20040902
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:23.03.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FD4D
Code Expl.:-EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID
 
Event date:13.05.2005 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:20.07.2005 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20050429
 
Event date:19.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:24.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 50102969 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:LENZING GERBER STUTE PARTNERSCHAFTSGESELLSCHAF, DE
 
Event date:24.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 50102969 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:TE CONNECTIVITY GERMANY GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNERS: LEIBER, HEINZ, DIPL-ING, 71739 OBERRIEXINGEN, DE; LEIBER, THOMAS, 80796 MUENCHEN, DE; TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH, 64625 BENSHEIM, DE
 
Event date:24.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 50102969 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:LEIBER, THOMAS, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNERS: LEIBER, HEINZ, DIPL-ING, 71739 OBERRIEXINGEN, DE; LEIBER, THOMAS, 80796 MUENCHEN, DE; TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH, 64625 BENSHEIM, DE
 
Event date:24.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 50102969 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:LEIBER, HEINZ, DIPL-ING, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNERS: LEIBER, HEINZ, DIPL-ING, 71739 OBERRIEXINGEN, DE; LEIBER, THOMAS, 80796 MUENCHEN, DE; TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH, 64625 BENSHEIM, DE
 
Event date:27.11.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
Owner Name:TE CONNECTIVITY GERMANY GMBH
Effective DATE:20151027
 
Event date:27.11.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
Owner Name:THOMAS LEIBER, DE
Effective DATE:20151027
 
Event date:27.11.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
Owner Name:HEINZ LEIBER, DE
Effective DATE:20151027
 
Event date:26.01.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20160127
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20160126
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:01.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 50102969 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:27.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20170929
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170131
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170801