Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1163686

EP1163686 - ELECTROMAGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.06.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.07.2005  [2005/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tyco Electronics AMP GmbH
Ampèrestrasse 12-14
64625 Bensheim / DE
For all designated states
Leiber, Heinz
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 34
71739 Oberriexingen / DE
For all designated states
Leiber, Thomas
Gentzstrasse 1/5
80796 München / DE
[2001/51]
Inventor(s)01 / LEIBER, Heinz
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 34
71739 Oberriexingen / DE
02 / LEIBER, Thomas
Gentzstrasse 1/5
80796 München / DE
03 / DÜNKEL, Dirk
Else-Lasker-Schüler-Strasse 11
64625 Bensheim / DE
04 / KÄHNY, Frank
Unterdeufstetter Strasse 10
74579 Fichtenau / DE
05 / HECKER, Ralf
Jakob-Anstatt-Strasse 7A
55130 Mainz / DE
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)LENZING GERBER
Patentanwälte Postfach 20 05 09
40103 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/30]LENZING GERBER
Patentanwälte Postfach 20 05 09
D-40103 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2001/51]Lenzing, Andreas, Dr.
Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Münsterstrasse 248
40470 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date01909656.918.01.2001
[2001/51]
WO2001EP00569
Priority number, dateDE200010229520.01.2000         Original published format: DE 10002295
DE200013986916.08.2000         Original published format: DE 10039869
[2001/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0154147
Date:26.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1163686
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001
[2001/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1163686
Date:28.07.2004
Language:DE
[2004/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01F7/08, H01F3/02, F01L9/04, H01F7/14
[2001/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2004/31]
Former [2001/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMAGNET[2001/51]
English:ELECTROMAGNET[2001/51]
French:ELECTRO-AIMANT[2001/51]
Entry into regional phase16.08.2001National basic fee paid 
03.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/11]
10.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2004Fee for grant paid
12.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]DE946169  (AEG) [A] 1 * page 2, line 11 - line 51 *;
 [A]EP0251321  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [A]WO9842958  (LSP INNOVATIVE AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE], et al);
 [A]DE19824537  (LSP INNOVATIVE AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE])