Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259357

EP1259357 - MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 05.09.2007  [2007/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scintilla AG
Postfach 632
4501 Solothurn / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
SCINTILLA AG
Postfach 632
CH-4501 Solothurn / CH
Inventor(s)01 / SCHAIBLE, Hermann
Haeslimattstrasse 6
CH-4562 Biberist / CH
02 / SIMM, Robert
Bergstrasse 4
CH-4566 Oekingen / CH
03 / MICHEL, Reto
Balmbergstrasse 39
CH-4524 Gunsberg / CH
 [2002/48]
Application number, filing date01909706.230.01.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001EP00956
Priority number, dateDE200010766519.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10007665
[2002/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0160570
Date:23.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1259357
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1259357
Date:03.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:B25D16/00
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI,   TR [2003/36]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:WERKZEUGMASCHINE[2002/48]
English:MACHINE TOOL[2002/48]
French:MACHINE-OUTIL[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase19.09.2002National basic fee paid 
19.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
20.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2003Fee for grant paid
02.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB03.09.2003
IT03.09.2003
TR03.09.2003
[2007/36]
Former [2006/51]GB03.09.2003
TR03.09.2003
Former [2004/45]GB03.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0437716  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,10-12 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 43; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE4441793  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5992257  (NEMETZ UWE [DE], et al) [A] * figures 1-3A *;
 [A]US3934688  (SIDES DANIEL HARRISON, et al) [A] * figures 5-7 *