EP1260032 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FAST DETECTION OF LOCATIONS OF PATH RAYS IN A RAKE RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATARIUS, Roozbeh 514 Nantucket Drive Cary, NC 27513 / US | 02 /
DAHLBÄCK, Erik Munktegelgränd 5 S-240 14 Veberöd / SE | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Vigars, Christopher Ian, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Vigars, Christopher Ian, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01909801.1 | 28.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001EP02247 | Priority number, date | US20000518063 | 02.03.2000 Original published format: US 518063 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0165714 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1260032 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1260032 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
H04B1/7085 (EP,US);
H04B1/7115 (EP,US);
H04B1/7113 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | 09.09.2002 | LT | 09.09.2002 | LV | 09.09.2002 | MK | 09.09.2002 | RO | 09.09.2002 | SI | 09.09.2002 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHNELLEN LAGEERKENNUNG EINES STRAHLENGANGS IN EINEM RAKE-EMPFÄNGER | [2002/48] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FAST DETECTION OF LOCATIONS OF PATH RAYS IN A RAKE RECEIVER | [2002/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DETECTION RAPIDE D'EMPLACEMENTS DE TRAJET DE RAYONS DANS UN RECEPTEUR RAKE | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2005 | BE | 27.04.2005 | CH | 27.04.2005 | CY | 27.04.2005 | FI | 27.04.2005 | FR | 27.04.2005 | IT | 27.04.2005 | LI | 27.04.2005 | NL | 27.04.2005 | TR | 27.04.2005 | DK | 27.07.2005 | GR | 27.07.2005 | SE | 27.07.2005 | ES | 07.08.2005 | PT | 10.10.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
IT | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
TR | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
IT | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 27.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5490165 (BLAKENEY II ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5,9,13,14,18 * column 6, line 38 - line 45 ** column 9, line 22 - column 10, line 13 *; | [Y]WO9719522 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,9-11,13,18 * page 10, line 5 - line 28; claims 1,4,8 *; | [YA]EP0877493 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,9-11,13,18 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 4 * * column 5, line 17 - column 7, line 45; figures 4,5 * * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 11 * [A] 3,6,7,12,15,16 |