Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259654

EP1259654 - METHOD FOR MAKING ALUMINIUM ALLOY STRIPS FOR MAKING CAN BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.06.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.07.2006  [2006/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novelis Inc.
70 York Street Suite 1510
Toronto, Ontario M5J 1S9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2005/48]For all designated states
Novelis, Inc.
70 York Street Suite 1510
Toronto, Ontario M5J 1S9 / CA
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Pechiney Rhenalu
7, place de Chancelier Adenauer
75116 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MENET, Pierre-Yves
7, rue Serpentine
F-68000 Colmar / FR
02 / HOFFMANN, Jean-Luc
28, rue J.S. Bach
F-67150 Matzenheim / FR
03 / RANQUET, Pierre
30, rue des Bonnes Gens
F-68000 Colmar / FR
04 / SOLIGNAC, Philippe
8, Clos des Muriers
F-68000 Colmar / FR
05 / CHENAL, Bruno
Lotissement Rivoire
F-38960 Saint-Etienne de Crossey / FR
06 / BASSON, Frédéric
13, rue de la République
F-38430 Moirans / FR
07 / MAIWALD, Klaus
Résidence du Parc
Les Châtaigniers, F-38430 Moirans / FR
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre
Cabinet Lavoix
62, rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/48]Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre
Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
Former [2002/48]Mougeot, Jean-Claude
PECHINEY, 217, cours Lafayette
69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Application number, filing date01909918.328.02.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001FR00576
Priority number, dateFR2000000278003.03.2000         Original published format: FR 0002780
[2002/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0164965
Date:07.09.2001
Language:FR
[2001/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1259654
Date:27.11.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:C22C21/08, C22C21/00, C22F1/047, C22F1/04, B22D11/06, B22D1/00, C22B21/06
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BLECHES AUS ALUMINIUM-LEGIERUNG GEEIGNET ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DOSENKÖRPERN[2002/48]
English:METHOD FOR MAKING ALUMINIUM ALLOY STRIPS FOR MAKING CAN BODIES[2002/48]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE BANDES EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM APTES A LA FABRICATION DE CORPS DE BOITES[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase09.09.2002National basic fee paid 
09.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
04.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/27]
17.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200606   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DA]US5616190  (LEGRESY JEAN-MARC [FR], et al) [DA] 1,18 * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH10152762  ;
 [A]US3930895  (MOSER CLARENCE J, et al) [A] 1,18 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4772319  (OTSUKA RYOTATSU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 56 - line 65 *;
 [DA]WO9701652  (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US], et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, [A] 1,18 * abstract *