Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257499

EP1257499 - SODIUM PERBORATE MONOHYDRATE PARTICLES AND THEIR MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.12.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 22.01.2003  [2003/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
U.S. BORAX INC.
26877 Tourney Road
Valencia, CA 91355-1847 / US
[2002/47]
Inventor(s)01 / HAYATI, Igan
35 Copse Close
Slough, Berkshire SL1 5DT / GB
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Marshall, Monica Anne
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Marshall, Monica Anne
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date01909959.723.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001GB00806
Priority number, dateGB2000000440624.02.2000         Original published format: GB 0004406
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0162664
Date:30.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257499
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:C01B15/12, C11D3/39
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:NATRIUMPERBORATMONOHYDRAT-TEILCHEN UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2002/47]
English:SODIUM PERBORATE MONOHYDRATE PARTICLES AND THEIR MANUFACTURE[2002/47]
French:PARTICULES DE MONOHYDRATE DE PERBORATE DE SODIUM ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2002National basic fee paid 
22.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
29.11.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/04]
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0328768  (DEGUSSA [DE]) [DA] 1,2,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3975500  (CASH DONALD EDWIN) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4185960  (BRICHARD JEAN [BE], et al) [A] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5395602  (HERZIG JOERG [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DD114051  (THIELE) [A] 1 * the whole document *