Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259189

EP1259189 - TOOTH INCLINATION ASSESSMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University College Cardiff Consultants Ltd.
P.O. Box 497 30-36 Newport Road Cardiff
Wales CF24 0DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/36]For all designated states
University College Cardiff Consultants Ltd.
P.O. Box 497 30-36 Newport Road Cardiff
Wales CF24 0DE / GB
Former [2005/09]For all designated states
University College Cardiff Consultants Ltd.
P.O. Box 497 30-36 Newport Road
Cardiff, Wales CF24 0DE / GB
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
University of Wales College of Medicine
Heath Park
Cardiff CF4 4XN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / RICHMOND, Stephen
11 Archer Road
Penarth Vale of Glamorgan CF64 3HW / GB
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Newell, William Joseph , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP
Temple Court
13A Cathedral Road
Cardiff
CF11 9HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Newell, William Joseph , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James Morgan Arcade Chambers 33 St. Mary Street
Cardiff, CF10 1AF / GB
Application number, filing date01909978.705.03.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001GB00948
Priority number, dateGB2000000505303.03.2000         Original published format: GB 0005053
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0164130
Date:07.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1259189
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1259189
Date:07.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61C19/04, A61B5/107
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABSCHÄTZUNG DER ZAHNNEIGUNG[2002/48]
English:TOOTH INCLINATION ASSESSMENT[2002/48]
French:EVALUATION DE L'INCLINAISON D'UNE DENT[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase18.09.2002National basic fee paid 
18.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
02.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2005Fee for grant paid
23.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.09.2005
BE07.09.2005
CY07.09.2005
FI07.09.2005
IT07.09.2005
NL07.09.2005
TR07.09.2005
DK07.12.2005
GR07.12.2005
SE07.12.2005
ES18.12.2005
PT07.02.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/37]AT07.09.2005
BE07.09.2005
FI07.09.2005
IT07.09.2005
NL07.09.2005
TR07.09.2005
DK07.12.2005
GR07.12.2005
SE07.12.2005
ES18.12.2005
PT07.02.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2007/36]AT07.09.2005
BE07.09.2005
FI07.09.2005
IT07.09.2005
NL07.09.2005
DK07.12.2005
GR07.12.2005
SE07.12.2005
ES18.12.2005
PT07.02.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2007/10]AT07.09.2005
BE07.09.2005
FI07.09.2005
NL07.09.2005
DK07.12.2005
GR07.12.2005
SE07.12.2005
ES18.12.2005
PT07.02.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/46]AT07.09.2005
BE07.09.2005
FI07.09.2005
NL07.09.2005
DK07.12.2005
GR07.12.2005
SE07.12.2005
ES18.12.2005
PT07.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT07.09.2005
BE07.09.2005
FI07.09.2005
NL07.09.2005
DK07.12.2005
GR07.12.2005
SE07.12.2005
ES18.12.2005
PT07.02.2006
Former [2006/25]BE07.09.2005
FI07.09.2005
NL07.09.2005
GR07.12.2005
SE07.12.2005
ES18.12.2005
PT07.02.2006
Former [2006/22]FI07.09.2005
NL07.09.2005
GR07.12.2005
SE07.12.2005
ES18.12.2005
Former [2006/14]FI07.09.2005
GR07.12.2005
SE07.12.2005
ES18.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI07.09.2005
SE07.12.2005
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4762491  (BOLTON WAYNE A [US]) [X] 1,2,4,14 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 47; figures 1-7 * [A] 9,13;
 [A]DE1766099  (KOERBER KARLHEINZ DR) [A] 3,15 * page 1, lines 26-37; figures 1,3 *