EP1254106 - CALCILYTIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | For all designated states NPS Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 550 Hills Drive 3rd Floor Bedminster, NJ 07921 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | ||
For all designated states NPS Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 550 Hills Drive 3th Floor Bedminster NJ 07921 / US | |||
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Corporation One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | ||
For all designated states NPS Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 550 Hills Drive 3th Floor Bedminster NJ 07921 / US | |||
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Corporation One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | ||
For all designated states NPS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 420 Chipeta Way Salt Lake City Utah 84108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAGO, Amparo M. 701 Pondview Drive Audubon, PA 19403 / US | 02 /
CALLAHAN, James, Francis 8214 Jeanes Street Philadelphia, PA 19119 / US | 03 /
BHATNAGAR, Pradip, Kumar 300 South Balderston Drive Exton, PA 19341 / US | 04 /
DEL MAR, Eric, G. 2967 East St. Marys Circle Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | 05 /
BRYAN, William, M. 110 Ivory Road Phoenixville, PA 19460 / US | 06 /
BURGESS, Joelle, L. 455 Silver Leaf Circle Trappe, PA 19426 / US | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Billson, Siân Catherine GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Hockley, Siân Catherine GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01910349.8 | 24.01.2001 | [2002/45] | WO2001US02402 | Priority number, date | US20000177683P | 24.01.2000 Original published format: US 177683 P | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0153254 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1254106 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1254106 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C255/50, A61K31/277 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
C07D303/22 (EP);
C07C255/50 (KR);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/18 (EP);
A61P5/22 (EP);
C07C211/30 (EP);
C07C233/05 (EP);
C07C251/48 (EP);
C07C255/57 (EP);
C07C255/58 (EP);
C07C69/616 (EP);
C07C69/738 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 14.08.2002 | SI | 14.08.2002 | Title | German: | CALCILYTISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | [2002/45] | English: | CALCILYTIC COMPOUNDS | [2002/45] | French: | COMPOSES CALCILYTIQUES | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09002553.7 / EP2141146 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.02.2009 | CY | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | TR | 25.02.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | [2017/41] |
Former [2017/36] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CY | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
TR | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CY | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
TR | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CY | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 25.02.2009 | |
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 25.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9845255 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9951569 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-15 * the whole document and particularly page 59, lines 7 and 8, page 48, lines 13-24 and page 49, lines 13-16 *; | [E]WO0108673 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-4,7-13,15* claims 1-8 *; | [X] - MANGNUS, E. M. ET AL, "Structural modifications of strigol analogs. Influence of the B and C rings on the bioactivity of the germination stimulant GR24", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY , 40(7), 1222-9 CODEN: JAFCAU; ISSN: 0021-8561, (1992), XP002336708 [X] 14 * pages 1222 and 1227, compound (21) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00019a030 | International search | [A]US4645678 (NOFRE CLAUDE [FR], et al); | [X]WO9737967 (NPS PHARMA INC [US], et al); | [X]WO9951241 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO9951569 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) |