Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258039

EP1258039 - COMMUNICATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2008
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
6501 William Cannon Drive West
Austin, TX 78735 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/50]For all designated states
Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
6501 William Cannon Drive West
Austin, Texas 78735 / US
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RAMDANI, Jamal
1082 West Thompson Way
Chandler, AZ 85248 / US
02 / DROOPAD, Ravindranath
4515 West Tyson Street
Chandler, AZ 85226 / US
03 / HILT, Lyndee, L.
3600 West Ray Road, 2078
Chandler, AZ 85226 / US
04 / EISENBEISER, Kurt, William
9442 South Beck Avenue
Tempe, AZ 85284 / US
 [2003/09]
Former [2002/47]01 / RAMDANI, Jamal
822 West Devon Drive
Gilbert, AZ 85233 / US
02 / DROOPAD, Ravindranath
4515 West Tyson Street
Chandler, AZ 85226 / US
03 / HILT, Lyndee, L.
3600 West Ray Road, 2078
Chandler, AZ 85226 / US
04 / EISENBEISER, Kurt, William
9442 South Beck Avenue
Tempe, AZ 85284 / US
Representative(s)Ferro, Frodo Nunes , et al
Freescale Semiconductor Inc
C/o Optimus Patents Limited
Grove House
Lutyens Close, Chineham Court
Basingstoke, RG24 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/20]Ferro, Frodo Nunes , et al
Freescale Semiconductor Inc c/o Impetus IP Ltd Groove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court
Basingstoke, RG24 8AG / GB
Former [2004/27]Wharmby, Martin Angus
Freescale Semiconductor Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Grove House Lutyens Close
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
Former [2002/47]McCormack, Derek James
Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link
Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date01910542.808.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001US04386
Priority number, dateUS2000050202310.02.2000         Original published format: US 502023
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0159836
Date:16.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258039
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/8258, H01L27/06
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG[2002/47]
English:COMMUNICATING DEVICE[2002/47]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase10.09.2002National basic fee paid 
10.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
21.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/52]
06.08.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
05.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4896194  (SUZUKI KATUMI [JP]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * column 3, line 12 - line 25 * * column 4, line 64 - line 65 * [Y] 2-7;
 [Y]JPH11260835  ;
 []US6045626  (YANO YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract *;
 [X]US5404581  (HONJO KAZUHIKO [JP]) [X] 8-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US5081062  (VASUDEV PRAHALAD [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 5, line 53 *;
 [A]JPS62216600
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, [Y] 2-7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880310), vol. 012, no. 077, Database accession no. (E - 589), [A] 1,8 * abstract *
Examination US5064781