Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1266287

EP1266287 - SERVER MONITORING USING VIRTUAL POINTS OF PRESENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mercury Interactive Corporation
1325 Borregas Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2002/51]
Inventor(s)01 / LEVY, Eli
60 Habanim Street
46379 Herzelia / IL
 [2002/51]
Representative(s)Manley, Nicholas Michael
WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]Manley, Nicholas Michael
W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date01910562.609.02.2001
[2002/51]
WO2001US04461
Priority number, dateUS2000053182121.03.2000         Original published format: US 531821
[2002/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0171498
Date:27.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1266287
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001
[2002/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/30
[2002/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERWACHUNG EINES SERVERS MITTELS VIRTUELLER ANWESENHEITSSTELLEN[2002/51]
English:SERVER MONITORING USING VIRTUAL POINTS OF PRESENCE[2002/51]
French:SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE DE SERVEUR UTILISANT DES POINTS DE PRESENCE VIRTUELS[2002/51]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2002National basic fee paid 
25.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
Examination procedure10.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.03.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US5819033  (CACCAVALE FRANK SAMUEL [US]) [A] 1-38 * column 23, line 32 - line 66 *;
 [A]US6006260  (BARRICK JR JAMES G [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - line 38 * * column 4, line 35 - line 50 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 15 * * column 5, line 52 - line 65 * * column 7, line 51 - line 67 *
 [A]  - "Mercury Interactive unveils hosted testing service", XEPHON NEWS, (20000121), page 1, URL: www.xephon.com/news/00012115.html, (20010910), XP002177059 [A] 1-38 * the whole document *
 [A]  - AMER P D, "A MEASUREMENT CENTER FOR THE NBS LOCAL AREA COMPUTER NETWORK", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19820801), vol. C-31, no. 8, ISSN 0018-9340, pages 723 - 729, XP000748220 [A] 1-38 * page 723, column L, line 42 - column R, line 6 * * page 725, column R, line 12 - line 20 * * page 726, column L, line 16 - line 24 *