Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259494

EP1259494 - ARYLOXYACETIC ACIDS FOR DIABETES AND LIPID DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.03.2010
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
[2010/10]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Kun
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
02 / XU, Libo
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
03 / JONES, A., Brian
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc.
European Patent Department
Merck Sharpe & Dohme Limited
Hertford Road, Hoddesdon
Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/48]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon
Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB
Former [2004/27]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Former [2002/48]Hiscock, Ian James , et al
European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Application number, filing date01910624.414.02.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001US04636
Priority number, dateUS20000183593P18.02.2000         Original published format: US 183593 P
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0160807
Date:23.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1259494
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.08.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07D261/20, A61K31/423, A61P3/10
[2004/38]
Former International [2002/48]C07D261/20, A61K31/423
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
Extension statesAL18.09.2002
LT18.09.2002
LV18.09.2002
MK18.09.2002
RO18.09.2002
SI18.09.2002
TitleGerman:ARYLOXYESSIGSÄUREN FÜR DIABETES UND LIPID-ERKRANKUNGEN[2002/48]
English:ARYLOXYACETIC ACIDS FOR DIABETES AND LIPID DISORDERS[2002/48]
French:ACIDES ARYLOXYACETIQUES UTILISES EN CAS DE DIABETE ET DE TROUBLES LIPIDIQUES[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase18.09.2002National basic fee paid 
18.09.2002Search fee paid 
18.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
10.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/16]
04.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
05.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US4728662  (SHUTSKE GREGORY M [DE], et al);
 [A]US5599821  (GLAMKOWSKI EDWARD J [US], et al)