Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255639

EP1255639 - INTRAOCULAR LENS MANUFACTURING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2007
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED
One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester
New York 14604-2701 / US
[2006/25]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED
One Bausch & Lomb Place
Rochester, New York 14604-2701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SARBADHIKARI, Kamal, K.
36 Willow Bend Drive
Penfield, NY 14526 / US
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Bowman, Paul Alan
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Bowman, Paul Alan
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date01910924.815.02.2001
[2002/46]
WO2001US05223
Priority number, dateUS2000050715118.02.2000         Original published format: US 507151
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0160594
Date:23.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1255639
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1255639
Date:21.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:B29D11/02
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON INTRAOKULARLINSEN[2002/46]
English:INTRAOCULAR LENS MANUFACTURING PROCESS[2002/46]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE LENTILLES INTRA-OCULAIRES[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase15.08.2002National basic fee paid 
15.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
15.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
05.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2006Fee for grant paid
26.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
CY21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
TR21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
PT21.11.2006
IE15.02.2007
LU15.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
CY21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
PT21.11.2006
IE15.02.2007
LU15.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/19]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
PT21.11.2006
IE15.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/10]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
PT21.11.2006
IE15.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/04]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
PT21.11.2006
MC28.02.2007
Former [2007/48]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
PT21.11.2006
MC28.02.2007
Former [2007/36]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/22]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/19]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/13]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/12]AT21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/03]AT21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
Former [2006/52]AT21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
Former [2006/51]FI21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
Former [2006/48]SE21.09.2006
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0328246  (SHEPHERD THOMAS H) [X] 12-16 * figures 1A-1F * [A] 1;
 [X]EP0920980  (MENICON CO LTD [JP]) [X] 12-14 * claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0552528  (MENICON CO LTD [JP]) [X] 12-14 * column 1, line 5 - line 10 *;
 [A]US5762836  (BOS GILLES [FR], et al) [A] 17-20 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0592228  (MENICON CO LTD [JP]) [A] 17-20 * figures 5,14,15 *