Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257208

EP1257208 - A CARRIAGE ASSEMBLY FOR CONTROLLING A STEERING WIRE STEERING MECHANISM WITHIN A FLEXIBLE SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2011
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tyco Healthcare Group LP
Mailstop 8 N-1 555 Long Wharf Drive
New Haven, CT 06511 / US
[2012/11]
Former [2009/51]For all designated states
Power Medical Interventions, LLC
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
Former [2007/36]For all designated states
Power Medical Interventions, Inc.
2021 Cabot Boulevard West
Langhorne, PA 19047 / US
Former [2003/48]For all designated states
Power Medical Interventions, Inc.
110 Union Square Drive
New Hope, PA 18938 / US
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Power Medical Interventions, Inc.
110 Union Square Drive
New Hope, PA 18938 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WHITMAN, Michael, P.
16 Pheasant Run
New Hope, PA 18938 / US
02 / BURBANK, John, E.
106 Haviland Road
Ridgefield, Connecticut 06877 / US
03 / NICHOLAS, David, A.
148 Cottage Street
Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US
 [2010/25]
Former [2003/09]01 / WHITMAN, Michael, P.
16 Pheasant Run
New Hope, PA 18938 / US
02 / BURBANK, John, E.
106 Haviland Road
Ridgfield, Connecticut 06877 / US
03 / NICHOLAS, David, A.
148 Cottage street
Rumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US
Former [2002/47]01 / WHITMAN, Michael, P.
16 Pheasant Run
New Hope, PA 18938 / US
Representative(s)Soames, Candida Jane , et al
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Soames, Candida Jane , et al
Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB
Former [2002/47]Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date01911007.121.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001US05435
Priority number, dateUS2000051092322.02.2000         Original published format: US 510923
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0162163
Date:30.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257208
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1257208
Date:23.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/115, A61B17/11, A61B17/072
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesAL08.08.2002
LT08.08.2002
LV08.08.2002
MK08.08.2002
RO08.08.2002
SI08.08.2002
TitleGerman:WAGENANORDNUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES LENKMECHANISMUS FÜR EINEN LENKUNGSDRAHT IN EINER FLEXIBLEN WELLE[2010/01]
English:A CARRIAGE ASSEMBLY FOR CONTROLLING A STEERING WIRE STEERING MECHANISM WITHIN A FLEXIBLE SHAFT[2002/47]
French:ENSEMBLE DE SUPPORT SERVANT A COMMANDER UN MECANISME DE DIRECTION D'UN FIL DE FER DANS UNE TIGE FLEXIBLE[2002/47]
Former [2002/47]WAGENANORDNUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES LENKMECHANISMUS VON EINEM LENKUNGSDRAHT IN EINER FLEXIBLEN WELLE
Entry into regional phase08.08.2002National basic fee paid 
08.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
08.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
19.12.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2010Fee for grant paid
10.05.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10004568.1  / EP2213252
EP10011064.2  / EP2292158
Opposition(s)24.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200303   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
TR23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
LU21.02.2011
CH28.02.2011
LI28.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
[2013/44]
Former [2013/25]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
LU21.02.2011
CH28.02.2011
LI28.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
Former [2011/48]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
CH28.02.2011
LI28.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
Former [2011/45]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
MC28.02.2011
Former [2011/19]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
Former [2011/13]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
Former [2011/10]AT23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
Former [2011/08]AT23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
Former [2011/01]AT23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
Former [2010/50]AT23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
Former [2010/49]AT23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]US5467911  (TSURUTA MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 29; figure 2 * * figure 6 *;
 [A]EP0705571  (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0552050  (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *