EP1259245 - NOVEL COMPOSITIONS AND USES OF DICTYOSTATIN COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARBOR BRANCH OCEANOGRAPHIC INSTITUTION, INC. 5600 U.S. 1 North Fort Pierce, FL 34964 / US | [2002/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, Amy, E. 423 Rouse Road Fort Pierce, FL 34946 / US | 02 /
CUMMINS, Jennifer, L. 6273 Bahia Del Mar, Unit 2 St. Petersburg, FL 33711 / US | 03 /
POMPONI, Shirley, A. 5710 Papaya Drive Fort Pierce, FL 34982 / US | 04 /
LONGLEY, Ross, E. 560 39th Court, S.W. Vero Beach, FL 32968 / US | 05 /
ISBRUCKER, Richard, A. 88 Bernard Avenue, Apt. 906 Toronto, Ontario M5A 1R7 / CA | [2007/32] |
Former [2003/20] | 01 /
WRIGHT, Amy, E. 423 Rouse Road Fort Pierce, FL 34946 / US | ||
02 /
CUMMINS, Jennifer, L. 6273 Bahia Del Mar, Unit #2 St. Petersburg, FL 33711 / US | |||
03 /
POMPONI, Shirley, A. 5710 Papaya Drive Fort Pierce, FL 34982 / US | |||
04 /
LONGLEY, Ross, E. 560 39th Court, S.W. Vero Beach, FL 32968 / US | |||
05 /
ISBRUCKER, Richard, A. 88 Bernard Avenue, Apt. 906 Toronto, Ontario M5A 1R7 / CA | |||
Former [2002/48] | 01 /
WRIGHT, Amy, E. 423 Rouse Road Fort Pierce, FL 34946 / US | ||
02 /
CUMMINS, Jennifer, L. 60 Knob Hill Road Hackettstown, NJ 07840 / US | |||
03 /
POMPONI, Shirley, A. 5710 Papaya Drive Fort Pierce, FL 34982 / US | |||
04 /
LONGLEY, Ross, E. 560 39th Court, S.W. Vero Beach, FL 32968 / US | |||
05 /
ISBRUCKER, Richard, A. 88 Bernard Avenue, Apt. 906 Toronto, Ontario M5A 1R7 / CA | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01911183.0 | 26.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001US06198 | Priority number, date | US20000184617P | 24.02.2000 Original published format: US 184617 P | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0162239 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1259245 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/00, A61K31/365, A61P35/00 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
A61K31/366 (EP,US);
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2002/48] | A61K35/00, A61K31/365 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Title | German: | NEUE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNG VON DICTYOSTATIN-VERBINDUNGEN | [2002/48] | English: | NOVEL COMPOSITIONS AND USES OF DICTYOSTATIN COMPOUNDS | [2002/48] | French: | NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS ET UTILISATIONS DE COMPOSES DE DICTYOSTATINE | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 14.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/03] | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]EP0680958 (UNIV ARIZONA [US]) [XD] 1-4,8-13 * page 3, lines 15-18 * * page 7, lines 32-35 * * page 4, lines 17-54 *; | [XD] - PETTIT, GEORGE R. ET AL, "Isolation and structure of the cancer cell growth inhibitor dictyostatin 1", J. CHEM. SOC., CHEM. COMMUN. (1994), (9), 1111-12, XP001013066 [XD] 1-3,8-13 * page 1111 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c39940001111 | [A] - D'AMBROSIO, MICHELE ET AL, "On the novel free porphyrins corallistin B, C, D, and E: isolation from the demosponge Corallistes sp. of the Coral Sea and reactivity of their nickel(II) complexes toward formylating reagents", HELV. CHIM. ACTA (1993), 76(4), 1489-96, XP001013065 [A] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19930760410 | [A] - REIN, T., Asymmetric horner-wadsworth-emmons reactions with aldehyde substrates: Scope and synthetic applications., BOOK OF ABSTRACTS, 213TH ACS NATIONAL MEETING, SAN FRANCISCO, APRIL 13-17 (1997), ORGN-400 PUBLISHER: AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, D. C., XP001013240 [A] 1-14 * abstract * |