Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1263563

EP1263563 - COMPACT CARTRIDGE HOT RUNNER NOZZLE AND METHOD OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOLD-MASTERS LIMITED
233 Armstrong Avenue Georgetown
Ontario L7G 4X5 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
MOLD-MASTERS LIMITED
233 Armstrong Avenue
Georgetown Ontario L7G 4X5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / GELLERT, Jobst, U.
7A Prince Street
Glen Williams, Ontario L7G 2X1 / CA
02 / BABIN, Denis
39 Early Street
Georgetown, Ontario L7G 5W8 / CA
03 / FISCHER, Jonathon
210 Chartwell Road
Oakville, Ontario L6J 3Z8 / CA
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01911310.905.03.2001
[2002/50]
WO2001CA00274
Priority number, dateUS2000052084308.03.2000         Original published format: US 520843
[2002/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0166333
Date:13.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1263563
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1263563
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/27, H05B3/42, B23P15/00
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMPAKTE ROHRHEIZKÖRPERHEISSKANALDÜSE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2002/50]
English:COMPACT CARTRIDGE HOT RUNNER NOZZLE AND METHOD OF MAKING[2002/50]
French:BUSE COMPACTE DE CANAL DE CAROTTE CHAUFFEE PAR CARTOUCHE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI[2002/50]
Entry into regional phase04.10.2002National basic fee paid 
04.10.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
06.12.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
12.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2004Fee for grant paid
23.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02027569.9  / EP1302295
EP02027570.7  / EP1302296
Opposition(s)21.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.10.2004
BE20.10.2004
CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
FR20.10.2004
IT20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
NL20.10.2004
TR20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
SE20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
CY05.03.2005
GB05.03.2005
LU05.03.2005
IE07.03.2005
PT20.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/36]AT20.10.2004
BE20.10.2004
CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
FR20.10.2004
IT20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
NL20.10.2004
TR20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
SE20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
CY05.03.2005
GB05.03.2005
LU05.03.2005
IE07.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/26]AT20.10.2004
BE20.10.2004
CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
FR20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
NL20.10.2004
TR20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
SE20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
CY05.03.2005
GB05.03.2005
LU05.03.2005
IE07.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/20]AT20.10.2004
BE20.10.2004
CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
FR20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
NL20.10.2004
TR20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
SE20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
CY05.03.2005
GB05.03.2005
IE07.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/10]AT20.10.2004
BE20.10.2004
CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
FR20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
NL20.10.2004
TR20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
SE20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
GB05.03.2005
IE07.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/51]AT20.10.2004
BE20.10.2004
CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
FR20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
NL20.10.2004
TR20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
GB05.03.2005
IE07.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/32]AT20.10.2004
BE20.10.2004
CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
FR20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
NL20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
GB05.03.2005
IE07.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/23]AT20.10.2004
BE20.10.2004
CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
NL20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
GB05.03.2005
IE07.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/14]AT20.10.2004
BE20.10.2004
CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
NL20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
GB05.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/13]AT20.10.2004
BE20.10.2004
CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
NL20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
GB05.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT20.10.2004
BE20.10.2004
CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
Former [2005/46]AT20.10.2004
CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
Former [2005/36]AT20.10.2004
CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
GR20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
Former [2005/27]CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
GR20.01.2005
ES31.01.2005
Former [2005/26]CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
GR20.01.2005
Former [2005/25]CH20.10.2004
FI20.10.2004
LI20.10.2004
Former [2005/24]FI20.10.2004
Cited inInternational search[DXY]US4120086  (CRANDELL WALTER R) [DX] 1-5 * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 5 * * claim 11 * [Y] 6-8,10,12,16,17,19-25,28-30,39;
 [Y]US5147663  (TRAKAS PANOS [US]) [Y] 12,19-25,28-30,39 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 47 * * figure 3 * * claim 27 *;
 [X]EP0748678  (EUROTOOL BEHEER B V [NL]) [X] 1,18-21,23 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 5 * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 4 *;
 [Y]DE3324901  (HOTSET HEIZPATRONEN ZUBEHOER [DE]) [Y] 6-8 * claims 2,3 *;
 [Y]US5136141  (TRAKAS PANOS [US]) [Y] 10 * claim 4 *;
 [Y]DE4242505  (HOTSET HEIZPATRONEN ZUBEHOER [DE]) [Y] 16 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE9201797U  (TÜRK & HILLINGER GMBH) [Y] 16,17 * figure 4 *;
 [Y]US4238671  (GELLERT JOBST U [CA]) [Y] 17 * figure 4 *;
 [PA]DE19941038  (GUENTHER HEISKANALTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1,18-23,39 * column 4, line 53 - line 67 * * claims 22-32 *;
 [A]EP0590621  (HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING [CA]) [A] 12-15 * abstract *