Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1264352

EP1264352 - ENERGY ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roth, Max
Rationen-Saarfall
7310 Bad-Ragaz / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
Roth, Max
Rationen-Saarfal
7310 Bad-Ragaz / CH
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Walder, Martin Bernhard , et al
Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8
7310 Bad Ragaz / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Walder, Martin Bernhard (CH) , et al
Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8
CH-7310 Bad Ragaz / CH
Application number, filing date01911311.715.03.2001
[2002/50]
WO2001CH00162
Priority number, dateCH2000005060016.03.2000         Original published format: CH 506002000
CH2000000202113.10.2000         Original published format: CH 202100
[2002/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0169688
Date:20.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1264352
Date:11.12.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/042, E04D13/18, E04D1/34, E04D1/18
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENERGIEELEMENT[2002/50]
English:ENERGY ELEMENT[2002/50]
French:ELEMENT A ENERGIE[2002/50]
Entry into regional phase02.09.2002National basic fee paid 
02.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
01.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/15]
09.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XA]JPH09177272  ;
 [XA]EP0031914  (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]) [X] 1-4,12,13,16,20,21 * page 3, line 30 - page 5, line 28; figures 1,2 * [A] 21,22,24;
 [A]DE19811399  (DACHZIEGELWERKE PFLEIDERER GMB [DE]) [A] 1-4,6,9,10,16,20-22,24 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9508194  (BLUE PLANET AG [LI], et al) [DA] 1-4,9,10,16-18,20-22,24 * page 6, line 11 - page 12, line 30; figures 1-12; claims 1,4,17,19,20 *;
 [A]JPH09209531  ;
 [A]CH601751  (SCHLATTER FRIEDRICH) [A] 1-4,7,10,16,20-22,24 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19851230  (STEIN KLAUS [DE]);
 [A]US5522944  (ELAZARI AMI [IL]);
 [PX]EP1079442  (SCHNEIDER LEICHTBAUSYSTEME [CH], et al) [PX] 1-4,9,12-15,20-22,24 * column 5, line 39 - column 10, line 44; figures 9-15; claims 1-18 *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09177272 A 19970708 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD;SHARP CORP) [X] 1,2,6,12-15,20-22,24 * abstract * [A] 16-19
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09209531 A 19970812 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD;SHARP CORP) [A] 1-3,8,9,20-22,24 * abstract *