Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258128

EP1258128 - SYSTEM AND MOBILE STATION FOR SENDING AND RECEIVING SOUND MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.12.2007  [2007/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Clothing Plus Oy
P.O. Box 26
38701 Kankaanpää / FI
[2002/47]
Inventor(s)01 / REHO, Akseli
Kankaistonkatu 19
FIN-38700 Kankaanpää / FI
02 / VANHALA, Jukka
Kokonkatu 4
FIN-33960 Pirkkala / FI
03 / VÄLIMÄKI, Elina
Hämeenpuisto 3 B 17
FIN-33210 Tampere / FI
04 / TASANEN, Mikko
Pajupuronkatu 6
FIN-33820 Tampere / FI
05 / IMPIÖ, Jussi
Pinninkatu 30 A 20
FIN-33500 Tampere / FI
 [2002/51]
Former [2002/50]01 / REHO, Akseli
Kankaistonkatu 19
FIN-38700 Kankaanpää / FI
02 / VANHALA, Jukka
Kokonkatu 4
FIN-33960 Pirkkala / FI
03 / VÄLIMÄKI, Elina
Hämeenpuisto 3 B 17
FIN-33210 Tampere / FI
04 / TASANEN, Mikko
Pajupuronkatu 6
FIN-33820 Tampere / FI
05 / IMPIÖ, Jussi
Jalavakatu 3 A 7
FIN-33820 Kankaanpää / FI
Former [2002/47]01 / REHO, Akseli
Koivikkotie 3 B 18
FIN-38700 Kankaanpää / FI
02 / VANHALA, Jukka
Kokonkatu 4
FIN-33960 Pirkkala / FI
03 / VÄLIMÄKI, Elina
Hämeenpuisto 3 B 17
FIN-33210 Tampere / FI
04 / TASANEN, Mikko
Pajupuronkatu 6
FIN-33820 Tampere / FI
05 / IMPIÖ, Jussi
Jalavakatu 3 A 7
FIN-33820 Kankaanpää / FI
Representative(s)Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo
Berggren Oy Ab
P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo
Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date01911793.621.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001FI00174
Priority number, dateFI2000000040021.02.2000         Original published format: FI 20000400
[2002/47]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0167723
Date:13.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258128
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE13.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/00, H04Q7/22, H04Q7/28
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND MOBILISATION ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON TONMELDUNGEN[2002/47]
English:SYSTEM AND MOBILE STATION FOR SENDING AND RECEIVING SOUND MESSAGES[2002/47]
French:SYSTEME ET STATION MOBILE DESTINES A ENVOYER ET A RECEVOIR DES MESSAGES SONORES[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase21.02.2001Translation filed 
22.08.2002National basic fee paid 
22.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
19.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/52]
07.08.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200707   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5697060  (AKAHANE MASAAKI [US]);
 [A]WO9913629  (WESBY PHILIP BERNARD [FI], et al);
 [A]WO9807239  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]);
 [A]US2285083  (COVER SR BERKEY E)