Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259541

EP1259541 - AMINO ACID SEQUENCES FACILITATING PENETRATION OF A SUBSTANCE OF INTEREST INTO CELLS AND/OR CELL NUCLEI [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.09.2010  [2010/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diatos S.A.
166, boulevard de Montparnasse
75014 Paris / FR
[2002/48]
Inventor(s)01 / AVRAMEAS, Eustrate
1, rue Sarasate
F-75015 Paris / FR
02 / TERNYNCK, Thérèse
39, boulevard Garibaldi
F-75015 Paris / FR
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Breesé, Pierre
Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/37]Breese, Pierre
NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
Former [2002/48]Breese, Pierre
3, avenue de l'Opéra
75001 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date01911821.501.03.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001FR00613
Priority number, dateFR2000000262101.03.2000         Original published format: FR 0002621
[2002/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0164738
Date:07.09.2001
Language:FR
[2001/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1259541
Date:27.11.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1259541
Date:05.09.2007
Language:FR
[2007/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/47
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VON HUMANEN PROTEINEN, WELCHE MIT HEPARIN REAGIEREN, ABGELEITETE AMINOSÄURESEQUENZEN, DIE DEN TRANSFER VON SUBSTANZEN VON INTERESSE IN DAS INNERE VON ZELLEN UND/ODER ZELLKERNEN ERLEICHTERN[2002/48]
English:AMINO ACID SEQUENCES FACILITATING PENETRATION OF A SUBSTANCE OF INTEREST INTO CELLS AND/OR CELL NUCLEI[2002/48]
French:SEQUENCES D'ACIDES AMINES DERIVEES DES PROTEINES HUMAINES REAGISSANT AVEC L'HEPARINE FACILITANT LE TRANSFERT DE SUBSTANCES D'INTERET A L'INTERIEUR DES CELLULES ET/OU DES NOYAUX CELLULAIRES[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2002National basic fee paid 
19.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
27.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2005Fee for grant paid
14.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04292771.5  / EP1526183
Opposition(s)06.06.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200303   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY05.09.2007
TR05.09.2007
[2010/37]
Former [2009/33]CY05.09.2007
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9856938  (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13-15,17-22,46-48,52-55 * abstract * * page 1, line 9 - line 14 * * page 4, line 1 - line 11 * * page 5, line 3 - line 24 * * page 6, line 4 - line 11 * * page 7, line 13 - line 20 * * page 8, line 5 - line 12 * * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 10 * * page 12, line 1 - line 11 * * page 13, line 21 - page 16, line 19 * * page 53, line 26 - page 64, line 27 * * page 81 - page 82; example 9 * * page 84 - page 86; example 11 * * SEQ ID NO: 166; page 181 * * page 223; revendications 1,2,4-6,11,13,14,16,20,34,35,40,41,44-48,53,56-58,64-66 * [Y] 23-45,49;
 [A]WO9104315  (SYMBICOM AB [SE]) [A] 1-7,9-16 * abstract * * page 2, line 17 - page 6, line 30 * * page 9, line 23 - page 20, line 3 * * page 25, line 23 - page 29, line 11 * * page 49, line 29 - page 51, line 13 * * page 62 - page 65; example 1 * * page 68 - page 72; example 4 * * page 81 - page 87; claims 1-27 *;
 [XY]WO9608274  (PRIZM PHARMA INC [US]) [X] 1-7,9,10,14,17-22,46-55 * abstract * * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 28 * * page 4, line 4 - page 7, line 24 * * page 9, line 14 - page 69, line 2 * * page 84 - page 98; examples 4-10 * * SEQ ID NO: 3; page 104 * * page 157 - page 161; claims 1-38 * [Y] 23-45;
 [DYA]WO9907414  (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al) [DY] 23-45,49 * abstract * * page 8, line 20 - line 23 * * page 56; claim 19 * [A] 50,51;
 [XA]  - GUEVARA JR., J.G. ET AL., "Nucleic Acid-Binding Properties of Low-Density Lipoproteins: LDL as a Natural Gene Vector", JOURNAL OF PROTEIN CHEMISTRY, (199911), vol. 18, no. 8, pages 845 - 857, XP000926097 [X] 1-10,13,17-19,21,22,46-48 * abstract * * page 846, column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 21 * * page 848, column 2, line 52 - page 849, column 1, line 52 * * page 849, column 2, line 6 - line 13 * * page 851, column 1, line 4 - line 7 * * page 854, column 2, line 1 - page 856, column 2, line 6 * * page 855; figure 7 * [A] 11,12,14-16,20,56,57,60

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1020627212272
 [A]  - WEISGRABER, K.H. & RALL, S.C. JR., "Human Apolipoprotein B-100 Heparin-binding Sites", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19870815), vol. 262, no. 23, pages 11097 - 11103, XP002186291 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - OHTA, H. ET AL., "Internalization of human extracellular-superoxide dismutase by bovine aortic endothelial cells", DATABASE MEDLINE, (199904), Database accession no. 94274140, XP002186296 [A] 1-7,9-19 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - MESRI, E.A. ET AL., "The heparin-binding domain of heparin-binding EGF-like growth factor can target Pseudomonas exotoxin to kill cells exclusively through heparan sulfate proteoglycans", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (199409), vol. 107, no. 9, pages 2599 - 2608, XP002186292 [X] 1-7,9,10,14,15,17-19,21,22,46,47,52,53 * abstract * * page 2599, column 1, line 13 - page 2600, column 1, line 4 * * page 2600, column 1, line 36 - line 55 * * page 2602, column 2, line 18 - page 2607, column 1, line 35; tables 2,3 * [Y] 23-45
 [DA]  - XU, G. ET AL., "Interaction of heparin with synthetic peptides corresponding to the C-terminal domain of intestinal mucins", GLYCOCONJUGATE JOURNAL, (199602), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 81 - 90, XP001042193 [DA] 1-7,9-16 * abstract * * page 81, column 2, line 7 - page 82, column 1, line 49 * * peptide F13-15; page 82, column 2, line 27 - line 29 * * page 87, column 2, line 45 - page 89, column 1, line 29 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01049683
 [DA]  - AMARA, A. ET AL., "Stromal Cell-derived Factor-1 alpha Associates with Heparan Sulfates through the First beta-Strand of the Chemokine", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19990820), vol. 274, no. 34, pages 23916 - 23925, XP002186293 [DA] 1-7,9-16 * abstract * * page 23916, column 2, line 30 - page 23917, column 1, line 23 * * page 23919, column 2, line 27 - page 23925, column 1, line 32 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.34.23916
 [A]  - OLOFSSON, A.M. ET AL., "Heparin-binding protein targeted to mitochondrial compartments protects endothelial cells from apoptosis", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (199910), vol. 104, no. 7, pages 885 - 894, XP002186294 [A] 1-7,9-19 * abstract * * page 886, column 1, line 14 - line 33 * * page 889, column 1, line 45 - page 891, column 1, line 7 * * page 892, column 2, line 23 - page 893, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI6671
 [A]  - POHL, J. ET AL., "AZUROCIDIN PRECURSOR (CATIONIC ANTIMICROBIAL PROTEIN CAP37) (HEPARIN-BINDING PROTEIN) (HBP)", DATABASE EMBL, HEIDELBERG, RFA, (19910201), Database accession no. P20160, URL: HOMO SAPIENS, XP002186297 [A] 1-7,9-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MARGALIT, H. ET AL., "Comparative Analysis of Structurally Defined Heparin Binding Sequences Reveals a Distinct Spatial Distribution of Basic Residues", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19930915), vol. 268, no. 26, pages 19228 - 19231, XP002186295 [A] 1-60 * the whole document *