Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257772

EP1257772 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PARTICULATE GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 10.10.2018  [2018/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GLATT GMBH
Bühlmühle
79589 Binzen / DE
[2002/47]
Inventor(s)01 / LEUENBERGER, Hans
Kreuzackerweg 12
CH-4148 Pfeffingen / CH
02 / PRASCH, Armin, K., T.
Beethovenstrasse 20
79100 Freiburg / DE
03 / LUY, Bernhard
Landsknechtstrasse 13
79102 Freiburg / DE
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Braun, André jr. , et al
Braunpat Braun Eder AG
Holeestrasse 87
4054 Basel / CH
[2018/41]
Former [2002/47]Zbinden, Paul A. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Eder AG Lindenhofstrasse 40
4052 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date01912033.623.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001IB00255
Priority number, dateCH2000003710025.02.2000         Original published format: CH 371002000
[2002/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0163191
Date:30.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257772
Date:20.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1257772
Date:10.10.2018
Language:DE
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:F26B5/06, F26B3/08
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2018/41]
Former [2002/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TEILCHENFÖRMIGEN GUTES[2002/47]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING PARTICULATE GOODS[2002/47]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT SOUS FORME DE PARTICULES[2018/19]
Former [2002/47]PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT SOUS FORME DE PARTICULES
Entry into regional phase01.06.2002National basic fee paid 
01.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
02.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2018Fee for grant paid
03.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.03.2004
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
11.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 18
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200909   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]CH686343  (GLATT MASCHINEN & APPARATEBAU [CH]) [A] 1,7,8,12,16 * column 13, line 45 - line 54; figure - *;
 [A]GB2116872  (ITALIANA ESSICCATOI, et al) [A] 1-3,5,17,18 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US3313032  (MALECKI GEORGE J) [DA] 1,7,8,12,16 * column W *;
 [A]CH646729  (AEROMATIC AG [CH]) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3916479  (MOEBUS ET AL) [A] 1,14-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]CH408781  (ANDERWERT FRITZ [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3300868  (FRITZ ANDERWERT) [A] 1 * column 6, line 34 - line 38; figure 5 *;
 [DA]EP0781587  (GLATT GMBH [DE]) [DA] 11 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1230133  (MASCHINENFABRIK FRIEDRICH HAAS GMBH);
 [A]CH681564  (GLATT MASCHINEN & APPARATEBAU);
 [A]EP0749769  (STORK FRIESLAND BV [NL]);
 [A]CH384471  (VICKERS ARMSTRONGS LTD [GB])