blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1264813

EP1264813 - GAS GENERATOR WITH AUTOMATIC FIRING FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  28.03.2014
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2014Revocation of patentpublished on 30.04.2014  [2014/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
1 Teppo-cho, Sakai-ku
Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8501 / JP
[2007/20]
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd.
1, Teppo-cho, Sakai-shi
Osaka 590-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMATO, Yo
940, Shinzaike, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1234 / JP
02 / WU, Jianzhou
26-23, Katsuhara-cho, Katsuhara-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1212 / JP
03 / TAKAHORI, Takeshi
610-1, Kamiyobe, Yobe-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1262 / JP
 [2003/06]
Former [2002/50]01 / YAMATO, Yo
940, Shinzaike, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1234 / JP
02 / WU, Jianzhou
1903-3, Yokohama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1254 / JP
03 / TAKAHORI, Takeshi
610-1, Kamiyobe, Yobe-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1262 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2002/50]Grünecker, August, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01912296.913.03.2001
[2002/50]
WO2001JP01944
Priority number, dateJP2000007153815.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000071538
[2002/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0168564
Date:20.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1264813
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1264813
Date:16.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.09.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2004
ClassificationIPC:C06D5/00, B60R21/26, C06C9/00, C06D5/06
[2005/05]
CPC:
B60R21/2644 (EP,US); B60R21/264 (KR); B60R21/16 (KR);
B60R21/26 (KR); C06C9/00 (EP,US); C06D5/06 (EP,US);
B60R2021/26064 (EP,US); B60R2021/2633 (EP,US); B60R2021/2648 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2002/50]C06D5/00, B60R21/26
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/22]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:GASERZEUGER MIT AUTOMATISCHER ZÜNDFUNKTION[2002/50]
English:GAS GENERATOR WITH AUTOMATIC FIRING FUNCTION[2002/50]
French:GENERATEUR DE GAZ A MISE DE FEU AUTOMATIQUE[2002/50]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2002Translation filed 
13.09.2002National basic fee paid 
13.09.2002Search fee paid 
13.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
13.09.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
27.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2006
06.11.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.11.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
22.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2007Fee for grant paid
13.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.01.2008    ADMISSIBLE
TRW Airbag Systems GmbH
Werner von Braun Strasse 1
85544 Aschau/Inn / DE
Opponent's representative
Sulzbach, Werner
Prinz & Partner GbR
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/09]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2008    ADMISSIBLE
TRW Airbag Systems GmbH
Werner von Braun Strasse 1
85544 Aschau/Inn / DE
Opponent's representative
Sulzbach, Werner
Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
25.03.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.07.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.02.2010Date of oral proceedings
25.02.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.02.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
08.11.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/18]
Appeal following opposition30.04.2010Appeal received No.  T0950/10
07.07.2010Statement of grounds filed
08.11.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
08.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
18.11.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB13.03.2009
FR23.11.2009
[2010/23]
Former [2010/21]FR23.11.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]US5959242  (KNOWLTON GREGORY D [US], et al) [X] 1-32* the whole document *
International search[X]US4561675  (ADAMS GARY V [US], et al);
 [X]US5380380  (POOLE DONALD R [US], et al);
 [X]JPH07232989  (NIPPON KAYAKU KK, et al)
by applicantUS4561675
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.