Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255772

EP1255772 - BIOSENSOR COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  07.08.2009
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
Suite 201, 707-A Texas Avenue
College Station, TX 77840 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
The Texas A & M University System
Suite 201, 707-A Texas Avenue
College Station, TX 77840 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAYLEY, Hagan, P.
1800 Springbrook Estates Drive
College Station, TX 77845 / US
02 / HOWORKA, Stefan, G.
310 Wisenbaker
College Station, TX 77843-3369 / US
03 / MOVILEANU, Liviu
4302 College Main 107
Bryan, TX 77801 / US
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date01912725.712.02.2001
[2002/46]
WO2001US04482
Priority number, dateUS20000182097P11.02.2000         Original published format: US 182097 P
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0159453
Date:16.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1255772
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/31, G01N33/543, C12Q1/00
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
Extension statesAL30.08.2002
LT30.08.2002
LV30.08.2002
MK30.08.2002
RO30.08.2002
SI30.08.2002
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR BIOSENSOREN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[2002/46]
English:BIOSENSOR COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE[2002/46]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE BIOCAPTEURS ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION ASSOCIES[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase30.08.2002National basic fee paid 
30.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
17.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2009Date of oral proceedings
23.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/37]
23.04.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.05.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/37]
Divisional application(s)EP09004629.3  / EP2083015
EP10010417.3  / EP2261240
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
19.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
20.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200909   M06   Fee paid on   06.03.2009
Cited inInternational search[XDY]WO9905167  (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US]) [XD] 1-4,6,7,13-42 * The whole document; see especially page 12, lines 24-25 * [Y] 5;
 [X]WO9620688  (WORCESTER FOUND EX BIOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,14-16,20-22 * See page 13-17,20-24; example 3; claims 1-5 *;
 [X]US5368712  (TOMICH JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,11-20,25-42 * The whole document; see especially column 7, line47 to column 8, line 2; column15 to 20,; example; claims 1-24; fig.1 and 15 *;
 [X]WO9720203  (SCHALKHAMMER THOMAS [AT], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,11-19,25-29,31-42 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - CORNELL E.A., "The gramicidin-based biosensor: a functional nano-machine", NOVARTIS FOUNDATION SYMPOSIUM, Chichester, (1999), vol. 225, pages 231 - 254, XP001052820 [X] 1-4,6-8,11-19,25,26,28,29,31-42 * The whole document; see especially abstract;page 231-237 *
 [XD]  - BAYLEY, "Designed membrane channels and pores", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 10, pages 94 - 103, XP001058234 [XD] 1-8,11-19,25,26,28,29,31-42 * See especially page 94, column 2 to page 95; page 97-99 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(99)80017-2
 [Y]  - BOEHMER, VOLKER, "Calixarenes macrocycles with (almost) unlimited possibilities", ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED. ENGL. (1995), 34(7), 713-45, XP002188229 [Y] 5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.199507131
 [PX]  - MOVILEANU L ET AL, "Detecting protein analytes that modulate transmembrane movement of a polymer chain within a single protein pore.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2000 OCT) 18 (10) 1091-5., XP002188230 [PX] 1-4,6-42 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/80295
 [PX]  - VAN DER GOOT E.A., "Sensing proteins outside of the box", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20001018), vol. 18, page 1037, XP002188231 [PX] 1-4,6-42 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/80217
 [PX]  - HOWORKA, "A protein pore with a single polymer chain tethered within the lumen", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DC US, (20000322), vol. 122, no. 11, pages 2411 - 2416, XP002188232 [PX] 1-4,7-9,14,20-25,31-42 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja993221h