EP1259646 - PYROPHOSPHOROLYSIS ACTIVATED POLYMERIZATION (PAP): APPLICATION TO ALLELE-SPECIFIC AMPLIFICATION AND NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCE DETERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states City of Hope 1500 East Duarte Road Duarte, CA 91010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states City of Hope 1500 East Duarte Road Duarte California 91010-3000 / US | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states City of Hope 1500 East Duarte Road Duarte California 91010-3000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Qiang 1310 Zinnia Street Upland, CA 91784 / US | 02 /
SOMMER, Steve, S. 201 Spinks Canyon Road Duarte, CA 91010 / US | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Brearley, Helen Rebecca, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Brearley, Helen Rebecca, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2002/48] | Marchant, James Ian Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01912883.4 | 22.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001US05527 | Priority number, date | US20000184315P | 23.02.2000 Original published format: US 184315 P | US20000187035P | 06.03.2000 Original published format: US 187035 P | US20000237180P | 03.10.2000 Original published format: US 237180 P | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0162975 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1259646 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1259646 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2565/301, C12Q2525/186 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2565/301, C12Q2535/125 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/301, C12Q2525/186 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYROPHOSPHOROLYSE-AKTIVIERTE POLYMERISIERUNG (PAP): ANWENDUNG FÜR ALLEL-SPEZIFISCHE AMPLIFIZIERUNG UND SEQUENZBESTIMMUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREN | [2002/48] | English: | PYROPHOSPHOROLYSIS ACTIVATED POLYMERIZATION (PAP): APPLICATION TO ALLELE-SPECIFIC AMPLIFICATION AND NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCE DETERMINATION | [2002/48] | French: | POLYMERISATION ACTIVEE PAR PYROPHOSPHOROLYSE (PAP): APPLICATION A L'AMPLIFICATION SPECIFIQUE D'ALLELE ET A LA DETERMINATION DE SEQUENCES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 23.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09166826.9 / EP2112233 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.09.2009 | CY | 02.09.2009 | DK | 02.09.2009 | FI | 02.09.2009 | IT | 02.09.2009 | TR | 02.09.2009 | GR | 03.12.2009 | PT | 04.01.2010 | LU | 22.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
LU | 22.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 02.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0892058 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1,44,55,64,79,88 * page 9, line 55 - page 10, line 3 * * page 10, line 25 - line 53 *; | [A] - SOMMER S S ET AL, "PCR AMPLIFICATION OF SPECIFIC ALLELES PASA IS A GENERAL METHOD FOR RAPIDLY DETECTING KNOWN SINGLE-BASE CHANGES", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 82 - 87, XP002201653 [A] 1-96 * figure 1; tables 1,2 * | [A] - TABOR S ET AL, "DNA SEQUENCE ANALYSIS WITH A MODIFIED BACTERIOPHAGE T7 DNA POLYMERASE", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19900515), vol. 265, no. 14, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 8322 - 8328, XP000307483 [A] 1 * page 8324, column L, paragraph L - column R * * page 8327 - page 8328 * | [PX] - LIU QIANG ET AL, "Pyrophosphorolysis-activated polymerization (PAP): Application to allele-specific amplification.", BIOTECHNIQUES, (200011), vol. 29, no. 5, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 1072 - 1083, XP002201654 [PX] 1-96 * figures 1-3; table 1 * |