Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259980

EP1259980 - TWO ETCHANT ETCH METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
P.O. Box 450A
Santa Clara, California 95052 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
P.O. Box 450A
Santa Clara, California 95052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KHAN, Anisul
125 Connemare Way 81
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / KUMAR, Ajay
510 Kenilworth Court
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
03 / CHINN, Jeffrey, D.
605 St. Croix Lane
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
04 / PODLESNIK, Dragan
1736 Oak Creek Drive
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date01913007.922.02.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001US05949
Priority number, dateUS2000051355225.02.2000         Original published format: US 513552
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0163657
Date:30.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1259980
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/3065
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2004/21]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:AETZVERFAHREN MIT ZWEI AETZMITTELN[2002/48]
English:TWO ETCHANT ETCH METHOD[2002/48]
French:PROCEDE DE GRAVURE A DEUX AGENTS DE GRAVURE[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase29.08.2002National basic fee paid 
29.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
29.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
31.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/10]
05.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO0004213  (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * figures 4-6,8 * * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 25 * * page 12, line 23 - page 34, line 9 * [Y] 9-13;
 [Y]GB2333267  (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 9-13 * figures 4,5 * * page 3, line 7 - line 29 * * page 5, line 25 - page 9, line 9 *;
 [XA]EP0746015  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figure 5 * * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 3 * [A] 4,7-13;
 [A]JPH0845907
 [A]  - PINTO R ET AL, "reactive ion etching in SF6 gas mixtures", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY,ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE,US, (198701), vol. 134, no. 1, ISSN 0013-4651, pages 165 - 175, XP002135036 [A] 7,8 * figures 1,6-9 * * paragraph [RESULTS] *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, [A] 1-13 * abstract *