blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1259941


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.09.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.10.2011  [2011/43]
22.10.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.11.2010  [2010/47]
11.09.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.10.2009  [2009/42]
21.08.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.09.2009  [2009/39]
23.01.2009 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.02.2009  [2009/09]
16.01.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2009  [2009/08]
28.11.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.12.2008  [2009/01]
12.11.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2008  [2008/49]
17.10.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.11.2008  [2008/47]
10.10.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2008  [2008/46]
22.08.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.09.2008  [2008/39]
15.02.2008 (Expected) grant published on  19.03.2008  [2008/12]
08.02.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.01.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.01.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.11.2007 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.09.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.09.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.08.2007 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.02.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.09.2006 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
09.02.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.09.2005 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
19.09.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
17.09.2005 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
13.09.2005 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
25.06.2005 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.03.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.02.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.11.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.11.2004 Deletion: Reply to examination report
27.09.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
31.08.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.04.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.04.2004 First examination report
13.02.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.04.2003 Change - extension states
13.02.2003 Renewal fee
11.10.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.11.2002  [2002/48]
11.10.2002 Request for examination filed published on  27.11.2002  [2002/48]
27.09.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
03.10.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
28.08.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
27.08.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
19.04.2001 PCT data prior to European publication