blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1259941
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4813732BGlobal Dossier 09.11.2011B2
JP2003523588 05.08.2003A
Priority number Date
DE10007308 17.02.2000
DE0100362 31.01.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1259941Global Dossier 19.03.2008B1
EP1259941 27.11.2002A1
Priority number Date
DE10007308 17.02.2000
DE0100362 31.01.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3914801 27.08.2001A
Priority number Date
DE10007308 17.02.2000
DE0100362 31.01.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2001239148B 01.12.2005B2
Priority number Date
DE10007308 17.02.2000
DE0100362 31.01.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR0108490 22.04.2003A
Priority number Date
DE10007308 17.02.2000
DE0100362 31.01.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE10190532D 30.01.2003D2
Priority number Date
DE10190532 31.01.2001
DE10007308 17.02.2000
DE0100362 31.01.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE50113758D 30.04.2008D1
Priority number Date
DE10007308 17.02.2000
DE0100362 31.01.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7076396 11.07.2006B2
US2003101019 29.05.2003A1
Priority number Date
DE10007308 17.02.2000
DE0100362 31.01.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0161653Global Dossier 23.08.2001A1
Priority number Date
DE10007308 17.02.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT389921T 15.04.2008T
Priority number Date
DE10007308 17.02.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1313983C 02.05.2007C
CN1422415 04.06.2003A
Priority number Date
DE10007308 17.02.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE10007308 23.08.2001A1
Priority number Date
DE10007308 17.02.2000