Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259941

EP1259941 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE REMAINING SERVICEABLE LIFE OF A PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.01.2009
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 26.10.2011  [2011/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2008/12]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KLAUSNER, Markus
3703 Wick Place
Wexford, 15090 / US
02 / GRIMM, Wolfgang
2780 Hunters Circle Twnhm 45
Allison Park, PA 15101 / US
 [2002/48]
Application number, filing date01913549.031.01.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001DE00362
Priority number, dateDE200010730817.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10007308
[2002/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0161653
Date:23.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1259941
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1259941
Date:19.03.2008
Language:DE
[2008/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:G07C5/08
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMITTLUNG DER VERBLEIBENDEN BETRIEBSDAUER EINES PRODUKTES[2002/48]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE REMAINING SERVICEABLE LIFE OF A PRODUCT[2002/48]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER LA DUREE DE VIE RESIDUELLE D'UN PRODUIT[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase17.09.2002National basic fee paid 
17.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
05.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2007Date of oral proceedings
04.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
31.08.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2008Fee for grant paid
02.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.12.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09]
Request for further processing for:09.09.2005Request for further processing filed
09.09.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.09.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY19.03.2008
DK19.03.2008
FI19.03.2008
IE19.03.2008
IT19.03.2008
NL19.03.2008
TR19.03.2008
SE19.06.2008
GR20.06.2008
ES30.06.2008
PT26.08.2008
[2011/43]
Former [2010/47]CY19.03.2008
DK19.03.2008
FI19.03.2008
IE19.03.2008
IT19.03.2008
NL19.03.2008
SE19.06.2008
GR20.06.2008
ES30.06.2008
PT26.08.2008
Former [2009/42]CY19.03.2008
DK19.03.2008
FI19.03.2008
IE19.03.2008
IT19.03.2008
NL19.03.2008
SE19.06.2008
ES30.06.2008
PT26.08.2008
Former [2009/39]DK19.03.2008
FI19.03.2008
IE19.03.2008
IT19.03.2008
NL19.03.2008
SE19.06.2008
ES30.06.2008
PT26.08.2008
Former [2009/08]DK19.03.2008
FI19.03.2008
IE19.03.2008
NL19.03.2008
SE19.06.2008
ES30.06.2008
PT26.08.2008
Former [2009/01]FI19.03.2008
NL19.03.2008
SE19.06.2008
ES30.06.2008
PT26.08.2008
Former [2008/49]FI19.03.2008
SE19.06.2008
ES30.06.2008
PT26.08.2008
Former [2008/46]FI19.03.2008
SE19.06.2008
ES30.06.2008
Former [2008/39]FI19.03.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0863490  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9,10,12,13 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0612643  (AUTENT INGENIEURGESELLSCHAFT F [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9,10,12,13 * abstract * * page 2, column 38 - page 5, column 24 *;
 [X]US4733361  (KRIESER URI R [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,10,12,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 18 - column 3, line 29 *;
 [A]EP0661673  (VALEO ELECTRONIQUE [FR])
by applicantDE19516481