Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1264362

EP1264362 - FIXING ELEMENT FOR A FOCUSING COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 10.11.2004  [2004/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2002/50]
Inventor(s)01 / LUCAS, Bernhard
Zehenderstrasse 2
74354 Besigheim / DE
02 / REICHERT, Andreas
Eichhaldenstrasse 37
71720 Oberstenfeld / DE
 [2002/50]
Application number, filing date01913565.603.02.2001
[2002/50]
WO2001DE00422
Priority number, dateDE200010826923.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10008269
[2002/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0163691
Date:30.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1264362
Date:11.12.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1264362
Date:27.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/12, H01Q1/32, G01S7/03
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2003/35]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:HALTERUNG FÜR EIN FOCUSSIERENDES BAUTEIL[2002/50]
English:FIXING ELEMENT FOR A FOCUSING COMPONENT[2002/50]
French:FIXATION POUR UN COMPOSANT DE FOCALISATION[2002/50]
Entry into regional phase23.09.2002National basic fee paid 
23.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
12.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2003Fee for grant paid
23.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES08.12.2003
[2004/46]
Cited inInternational search[DX]DE19739298  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DX] 1 * columns 2-3; figure 1 *;
 [X]US4460900  (CONRAD HELMUT [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2,4 *;
 [A]US5008678  (HERMAN MARTIN I [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 33; figures 1-5 *