Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255868

EP1255868 - ALTERED RECOMBINASES FOR GENOME MODIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.10.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY
900 Welch Road, Suite 350
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1850 / US
[2010/48]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY
900 Welch Road, Suite 350
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1850 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CALOS, Michele, P.
126 La Honda Road
Woodside, CA / US
02 / SCLIMENTI, Christopher, R.
1113 Pheasant Hill Way
San Jose, CA 95120 / US
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Brasnett, Adrian Hugh , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Brasnett, Adrian Hugh , et al
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date01914401.316.02.2001
[2002/46]
WO2001US05269
Priority number, dateUS20000183759P18.02.2000         Original published format: US 183759 P
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0161049
Date:23.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1255868
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1255868
Date:01.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.08.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12N11/04, C12N15/74, C12N15/87, C07H21/04
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERÄNDERTE REKOMBINASEN ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG DES GENOMS[2002/46]
English:ALTERED RECOMBINASES FOR GENOME MODIFICATION[2002/46]
French:RECOMBINASES MODIFIEES PERMETTANT UNE MODIFICATION DU GENOME[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase30.08.2002National basic fee paid 
30.08.2002Search fee paid 
30.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
20.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.03.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.2010Fee for grant paid
18.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.09.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
06.06.2008Request for further processing filed
06.06.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.12.2010
BE01.12.2010
CY01.12.2010
DK01.12.2010
FI01.12.2010
SE01.12.2010
TR01.12.2010
IE16.02.2011
LU16.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
GR02.03.2011
PT01.04.2011
[2013/44]
Former [2013/25]AT01.12.2010
BE01.12.2010
CY01.12.2010
DK01.12.2010
FI01.12.2010
SE01.12.2010
IE16.02.2011
LU16.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
GR02.03.2011
PT01.04.2011
Former [2012/08]AT01.12.2010
BE01.12.2010
CY01.12.2010
DK01.12.2010
FI01.12.2010
SE01.12.2010
IE16.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
GR02.03.2011
PT01.04.2011
Former [2011/47]AT01.12.2010
BE01.12.2010
CY01.12.2010
DK01.12.2010
FI01.12.2010
SE01.12.2010
MC28.02.2011
GR02.03.2011
PT01.04.2011
Former [2011/45]AT01.12.2010
BE01.12.2010
CY01.12.2010
FI01.12.2010
SE01.12.2010
MC28.02.2011
GR02.03.2011
PT01.04.2011
Former [2011/35]AT01.12.2010
BE01.12.2010
CY01.12.2010
FI01.12.2010
SE01.12.2010
GR02.03.2011
PT01.04.2011
Former [2011/31]AT01.12.2010
CY01.12.2010
FI01.12.2010
SE01.12.2010
GR02.03.2011
Former [2011/24]CY01.12.2010
FI01.12.2010
SE01.12.2010
Documents cited:Search[E]WO0238613  (ARTEMIS PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [X]  KUHSTOSS S ET AL, "ANALYSIS OF THE INTEGRATION FUNCTION OF THE STREPTOMYCETE BACTERIOPHAGE PHIC31", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (1991), vol. 222, no. 4, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 897 - 908, XP009012985 [X] 17-22 * The Seq. ORF613 of Bacteriophage phi-C31 (with the entry Q38194 in Uniprot) shows 99.7% identity with SEQ ID N°22-23-24 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(91)90584-S
International search[A]US5888732  (HARTLEY JAMES L [US], et al)
 [X]  - DORGAI ET AL., "Identifying determinants of recombination specificity: construction and characterization of mutant bacteriophage integrases", J. MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 252, pages 178 - 188, XP002941865

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1995.0486
 [Y]  - THORPE ET AL., "In vitro site-specific integration of bacteriophage DNA catalyzed by a recombinase of the resolvase/invertase family", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 5505 - 5510, XP002941866

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.10.5505
 [Y]  - MATSUURA ET AL., "The sre gene (ORF469) encodes a site-specific recombinase responsible for integration of the R4 phage genome", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 178, no. 11, pages 3374 - 3376, XP002941867
 [Y]  - CHRISTIANSEN ET AL., "A resolvase-like protein is required for the site-specific integration of the temperature lactococcal bacteriophage TP901-1", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 178, no. 17, pages 5164 - 5173, XP002941868
 [X]  - HARTUNG ET AL., "Cre mutants with altered DNA binding properties", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 273, no. 36, pages 22884 - 22891, XP002941869

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.36.22884
 [A]  - BUCHHOLZ ET AL., "Improved properties of FLP recombinase evolved by cycling mutagenesis", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, pages 657 - 662, XP002941870

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0798-657
by applicant   - THYAGARAJAN, B. ET AL., GENE, (2000), vol. 244, pages 47 - 54,
    - DORGAI ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 252, pages 178 - 188,