EP1259830 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING TRUE TRANSMITTED POWER USING A BROADBAND DUAL DIRECTIONAL COUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road, CN 5300 Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road, CN 5300 Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURSKI, Zygmond 133 Rosewood Drive Florence, NJ 08505 / US | 02 /
GELLER, Bernard, Dov 9 Danesfield Court Durham, NC 27707 / US | [2003/04] |
Former [2002/48] | 01 /
TURSKI, Zygmond 133 Rosewood Drive Florence, NJ 08505 / US | ||
02 /
GELLER, Bernard, Dov 11 Kensington Court Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Pratt, Richard Wilson D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01914432.8 | 22.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001US05637 | Priority number, date | US20000186546P | 02.03.2000 Original published format: US 186546 P | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0165267 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259830 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01R21/12, G01R21/10 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G01R21/10 (EP,US);
G01R21/04 (KR);
G01R21/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/48] | G01R21/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER ECHTEN SENDELEISTUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES BREITBAND-DOPPEL-RICHTUNGSKOPPLERS | [2002/48] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING TRUE TRANSMITTED POWER USING A BROADBAND DUAL DIRECTIONAL COUPLER | [2002/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA MESURE DE LA PUISSANCE EFFICACE TRANSMISE A L'AIDE D'UN COUPLEUR DIRECTIF DOUBLE A LARGE BANDE | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 23.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0404294 (TECHNOPHONE LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * column 5, line 11 - column 8, line 20; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0611100 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * column 3, line 16 - line 38; figure 4 *; | [A]US4547746 (ERICKSON ALAN R [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 2; figure 2 *; | [A]WO9844661 (MAXON SYSTEMS INC LONDON LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 5, line 11 - page 8, line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0604203 (HARRIS CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 4; figure 1 * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 37; figure 5 *; | [A]US4211911 (DEHN RUDOLPH A [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 3; figure 2 * | International search | [Y]US3789301 (MALAVIYA S); | [Y]US5049816 (MOSLEHI MEHRDAD M [US]); | [Y]US5530923 (HEINONEN JARMO [FI], et al); | [Y]US6147502 (FRYER MICHAEL O [US], et al) |